This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2019 at 07:53:49 (UTC).

Neutral Gray Music et al v. Tri-City Funding & Management, L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2019 Neutral Gray Music filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Tri-City Funding Management, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles Eskridge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04230

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles Eskridge

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DSF Productions

Wut'Shawan'a Do Music, Inc.

Notting Dale Songs

Pure Love Music

Naughty Music

Neutral Gray Music

Tarpo Music Publishing

Dorrough Music Publishing

Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc.

Defendants

Tri-City Funding & Management, L.L.C.

Clint Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stacy R Obenhaus

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8A before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#5

(#5) Register of Copyrights Notified. AO-121, filed. (MelissaMorgan, 4) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(MelissaMorgan, 4) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

3 #1

Supplement Summons in a Civil Action - Clint Smith

#3

(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons in a Civil Action - Clint Smith)(Obenhaus, Stacy) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#2

(#2) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by DSF Productions, Dorrough Music Publishing, Naughty Music, Neutral Gray Music, Notting Dale Songs, Pure Love Music, Tarpo Music Publishing, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., Wut'Shawan'a Do Music, Inc., filed.(Obenhaus, Stacy) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23446891) filed by DSF Productions, Pure Love Music, Dorrough Music Publishing, Notting Dale Songs, Naughty Music, Tarpo Music Publishing, Neutral Gray Music, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., Wut'Shawan'a Do Music, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Obenhaus, Stacy) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8A before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Register of Copyrights Notified. AO-121, filed. (MelissaMorgan, 4) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(MelissaMorgan, 4) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons in a Civil Action - Clint Smith)(Obenhaus, Stacy) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by DSF Productions, Dorrough Music Publishing, Naughty Music, Neutral Gray Music, Notting Dale Songs, Pure Love Music, Tarpo Music Publishing, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., Wut'Shawan'a Do Music, Inc., filed.(Obenhaus, Stacy) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23446891) filed by DSF Productions, Pure Love Music, Dorrough Music Publishing, Notting Dale Songs, Naughty Music, Tarpo Music Publishing, Neutral Gray Music, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., Wut'Shawan'a Do Music, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Obenhaus, Stacy) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less