This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:22:29 (UTC).

Neurosurgical Associates, P.C. v. Golub

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Neurosurgical Associates, P C filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Golub. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jed S. Rakoff. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11179

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jed S. Rakoff

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Neurosurgical Associates, P.C.

Defendants

Benjamin Golub

Benjamin J. Golub

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven W Kaiser

Attorney at Law Office Steven W. Kaiser

134 Hawthorne Avenue

Floral Park, NY 11001

Defendant Attorney

Solomon N. Klein

Attorney at Schlam Stone & Dolan LLP

26 Broadway

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Benjamin Golub. (dnh) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#7

(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Benjamin Golub, re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Neurosurgical Associates, P.C.. (Kaiser, Steven) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#6

(#6) FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Neurosurgical Associates, P.C..(Kaiser, Steven) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT against Benjamin Golub. Document filed by Neurosurgical Associates, P.C..(Kaiser, Steven) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven W Kaiser on behalf of Neurosurgical Associates, P.C.. (Kaiser, Steven) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: The Honorable Jed S. Rakoff, U.S.D.J. has ordered that counsel for all parties attend a conference, at the time and place fixed below, for the purpose of case management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 1-22-2020, AT THE UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 500 PEARL STREET, NEW YORK, N.Y. IN COURTROOM 14-B AT 11:00 am. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 1/22/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/20/2019) (ama) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Klein, Solomon) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 -- State Court Docket

1 #1

Exhibit 1 -- Summons with Notice

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 656153/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18225405).Document filed by Benjamin Golub. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Summons with Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 -- State Court Docket)(Klein, Solomon) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: ( Initial Conference set for 2/14/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Benjamin Golub. (dnh) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Benjamin Golub, re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Neurosurgical Associates, P.C.. (Kaiser, Steven) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Neurosurgical Associates, P.C..(Kaiser, Steven) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT against Benjamin Golub. Document filed by Neurosurgical Associates, P.C..(Kaiser, Steven) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven W Kaiser on behalf of Neurosurgical Associates, P.C.. (Kaiser, Steven) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 1/2/2020. (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 12/24/2019, ( Initial Conference set for 1/29/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: The Honorable Jed S. Rakoff, U.S.D.J. has ordered that counsel for all parties attend a conference, at the time and place fixed below, for the purpose of case management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 1-22-2020, AT THE UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 500 PEARL STREET, NEW YORK, N.Y. IN COURTROOM 14-B AT 11:00 am. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 1/22/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/20/2019) (ama) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (dnh) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Solomon N. Klein. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 1 (Citizen of This State); Dollar Demand $82,000,000; County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $82,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Solomon N. Klein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Benjamin Golub. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted. (dnh) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Klein, Solomon) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 656153/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18225405).Document filed by Benjamin Golub. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Summons with Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 -- State Court Docket)(Klein, Solomon) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.