This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 08:01:55 (UTC).

NEUROPTICS, INC. v. BRIGHTLAMP, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 NEUROPTICS, INC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against BRIGHTLAMP, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra McVicker Lynch and Jane Magnus-Stinson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04832

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Debra McVicker Lynch

Presiding Judge

Jane Magnus-Stinson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEUROPTICS, INC.

Defendant

BRIGHTLAMP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jenai M. Brackett

Attorney at FROST BROWN TODD LLC (Indianapolis)

201 North Illinois Street, Suite 1900, P.O. Box 44961

Indianapolis, IN 46244-0961

Kandi Kilkelly Hidde

Attorney at FROST BROWN TODD LLC (Indianapolis)

201 North Illinois Street, Suite 1900, P.O. Box 44961

Indianapolis, IN 46244-0961

Joey K. Liu

One Llp, 4000 Macarthur Blvd., Suite 500, East Tower

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Nathaniel L. Dilger

One Llp, 4000 Macarthur Blvd., Suite 500, East Tower

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorney

Norman J. Hedges

Attorney at INDIANA UNIVERSITY MAURER SCHOOL OF LAW INTELLECTUAL

211 South Indiana Avenue

Bloomington, IN 47405

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2020 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/23/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#17

(#17) ORDER granting Defendants' #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 2/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/23/2020. (SWM) (Main Document 17 replaced on 1/23/2020) (JD). (Entered: 01/23/2020)

16 #1

Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to file Answer

#16

(#16) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint , filed by Defendant BRIGHTLAMP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to file Answer)(Hedges, Norman) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Complaint, filed by Defendant BRIGHTLAMP, INC. (Hedges, Norman) (Entered: 12/22/2019)

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BRIGHTLAMP, INC.. (Hedges, Norman) (Entered: 12/22/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Counsel Norman J. Hedges, filed by Defendant BRIGHTLAMP, INC. (Hedges, Norman) Modified on 12/23/2019 (JDH). (Entered: 12/22/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Joey K. Liu for NEUROPTICS, INC. added. The court FURTHER ORDERS that Joey K. Liu register as a user of the court's electronic case filing system by December 18, 2019. Failure to register could result in the revocation of his admission pro hac vice. Copy to Joey K. Liu via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/12/2019. (SWM) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Nathaniel L. Dilger for NEUROPTICS, INC. added. The court FURTHER ORDERS that Nathaniel L. Dilger register as a user of the court's electronic case filing system by December 18, 2019. Failure to register could result in the revocation of his admission pro hac vice. Copy to Nathaniel L. Dilger via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/12/2019. (SWM) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#10

(#10) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

9 #1

Complaint filed 12/06/2019

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint filed 12/06/2019) (JDH) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

6 #2

Text of Proposed Order

6 #1

Exhibit A - Certification

#6

(#6) MOTION for Attorney(s) Joey K. Liu to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5756743), filed by Plaintiff NEUROPTICS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hidde, Kandi) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

5 #2

Text of Proposed Order

5 #1

Exhibit A - Certification

#5

(#5) MOTION for Attorney(s) Nathaniel L. Dilger to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5756728), filed by Plaintiff NEUROPTICS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hidde, Kandi) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2020 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/23/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting Defendants' #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 2/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/23/2020. (SWM) (Main Document 17 replaced on 1/23/2020) (JD). (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint , filed by Defendant BRIGHTLAMP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to file Answer)(Hedges, Norman) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Complaint, filed by Defendant BRIGHTLAMP, INC. (Hedges, Norman) (Entered: 12/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BRIGHTLAMP, INC.. (Hedges, Norman) (Entered: 12/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Counsel Norman J. Hedges, filed by Defendant BRIGHTLAMP, INC. (Hedges, Norman) Modified on 12/23/2019 (JDH). (Entered: 12/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Joey K. Liu for NEUROPTICS, INC. added. The court FURTHER ORDERS that Joey K. Liu register as a user of the court's electronic case filing system by December 18, 2019. Failure to register could result in the revocation of his admission pro hac vice. Copy to Joey K. Liu via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/12/2019. (SWM) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Nathaniel L. Dilger for NEUROPTICS, INC. added. The court FURTHER ORDERS that Nathaniel L. Dilger register as a user of the court's electronic case filing system by December 18, 2019. Failure to register could result in the revocation of his admission pro hac vice. Copy to Nathaniel L. Dilger via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/12/2019. (SWM) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint filed 12/06/2019) (JDH) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to BRIGHTLAMP, INC. (REO) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Attorney(s) Joey K. Liu to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5756743), filed by Plaintiff NEUROPTICS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hidde, Kandi) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Attorney(s) Nathaniel L. Dilger to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5756728), filed by Plaintiff NEUROPTICS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hidde, Kandi) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEUROPTICS, INC.. (Hidde, Kandi) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jenai M. Brackett on behalf of Plaintiff NEUROPTICS, INC.. (Brackett, Jenai) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Kandi Kilkelly Hidde on behalf of Plaintiff NEUROPTICS, INC.. (Hidde, Kandi) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BRIGHTLAMP, INC., filed by NEUROPTICS, INC.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5756682) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Hidde, Kandi) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less