This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/03/2023 at 08:48:51 (UTC).

Network-1 Technologies, Inc. v. Panasonic Holdings Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 Network-1 Technologies, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Panasonic Holdings Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00430

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Network-1 Technologies, Inc.

Defendants

Panasonic Holdings Corporation

Panasonic Corporation of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jack Wesley Hill

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #5

Exhibit 4

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Network-1 Technologies, Inc. (Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Network-1 Technologies, Inc.. (Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Summons(es)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Network-1 Technologies, Inc.. Panasonic Corporation of North America served on 11/7/2022, answer due 11/28/2022. (Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Network-1 Technologies, Inc.. Panasonic Holdings Corporation waiver sent on 11/17/2022, answer due 2/15/2023. (Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due Deadline Updated for Panasonic Corporation of North America to 2/15/2023. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for Panasonic Corporation of North America to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/22/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for Panasonic Corporation of North America to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond by Network-1 Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Network-1 Technologies, Inc.. Panasonic Holdings Corporation waiver sent on 11/17/2022, answer due 2/15/2023. (Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Network-1 Technologies, Inc.. Panasonic Corporation of North America served on 11/7/2022, answer due 11/28/2022. (Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Holdings Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Network-1 Technologies, Inc.. (Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Network-1 Technologies, Inc. (Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Holdings Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9213090.), filed by Network-1 Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less