This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/05/2022 at 09:57:53 (UTC).

Network-1 Technologies, Inc. v. Fortinet, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/06/2022 Network-1 Technologies, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Fortinet, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01319

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Network-1 Technologies, Inc.

Defendant

Fortinet, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian E. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Michael J. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lam) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,218,930 B1. (lam) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Fortinet, Inc. on 10/6/2022. (lam) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Network-1 Technologies, Inc..Fortinet, Inc. served on 10/11/2022, answer due 11/1/2022. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #7 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Fortinet, Inc. answer due 1/3/2023). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/14/2022. (dlw) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint - filed by Network-1 Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Michael) Modified on 11/14/2022 (dlw). (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Fortinet, Inc. answer due 12/1/2022). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/17/2022. (dlw) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint - filed by Network-1 Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnan, Michael) Modified on 10/17/2022 (dlw). (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Network-1 Technologies, Inc..Fortinet, Inc. served on 10/11/2022, answer due 11/1/2022. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01318-MN, 1:22-cv-01319-MN, 1:22-cv-01320-MN, 1:22-cv-01321-MN (rjb) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Fortinet, Inc. on 10/6/2022. (lam) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,218,930 B1. (lam) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lam) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement with Jury Demand against Fortinet, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3976747.) - filed by Network-1 Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet (lam) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less