This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/30/2022 at 14:51:27 (UTC).

Netlist, Inc. v. MICRON TECHNOLOGY TEXAS, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/01/2022 Netlist, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against MICRON TECHNOLOGY TEXAS, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00294

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Netlist, Inc.

Defendants

MICRON TECHNOLOGY TEXAS, LLC

Micron Semiconductor Products Inc

Micron Technology Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Samuel Franklin Baxter

Attorney at McKool Smith, P.C. - Marshall

104 East Houston St, Suite 300

Marshall, TX 75670

Hong Annita Zhong

Attorney at Irell & Manella LLP - Los Angeles

1800 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4276

Jason G Sheasby

Attorney at Irell & Manella LLP - Los Angeles

1800 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4276

Jennifer Leigh Truelove

Attorney at McKool Smith, P.C. - Marshall

104 East Houston St, Suite 300

Marshall, TX 75670

Michael William Tezyan

Attorney at Irell & Manella, LLP

1800 Avenue Of The Stars, Ste 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Thomas C Werner

Attorney at Irell & Manella LLP - Los Angeles

1800 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4276

Yanan Zhao

Attorney at Irell & Manella LLP

1800 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Natalie Lynn Arbaugh

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

2501 N. Harwood St, 17Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201

Andrea Leigh Fair

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Charles Everingham, IV

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Jack Wesley Hill

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Michael Robert Rueckheim

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - Redwood City

255 Shoreline Drive, Ste 520

Redwood City, CA 94065

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) ORDER granting #25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply . Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/28/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

25 #1

Text of Proposed Order

25 #25

Main Document

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Everingham, IV on behalf of MICRON TECHNOLOGY TEXAS, LLC, Micron Semiconductor Products Inc, Micron Technology Inc (Everingham, Charles) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of MICRON TECHNOLOGY TEXAS, LLC, Micron Semiconductor Products Inc, Micron Technology Inc (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of MICRON TECHNOLOGY TEXAS, LLC, Micron Semiconductor Products Inc, Micron Technology Inc (Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

21 #3

Text of Proposed Order

21 #1

Exhibit 1

21 #21

Main Document

5 #2

Summons(es) Micron Technology, Inc.

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Netlist, Inc. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Leigh Truelove on behalf of Netlist, Inc. (Truelove, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER granting #25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply . Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/28/2022. (nkl, ) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Everingham, IV on behalf of MICRON TECHNOLOGY TEXAS, LLC, Micron Semiconductor Products Inc, Micron Technology Inc (Everingham, Charles) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of MICRON TECHNOLOGY TEXAS, LLC, Micron Semiconductor Products Inc, Micron Technology Inc (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of MICRON TECHNOLOGY TEXAS, LLC, Micron Semiconductor Products Inc, Micron Technology Inc (Hill, Jack Wesley) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Opposed MOTION to Stay by MICRON TECHNOLOGY TEXAS, LLC, Micron Semiconductor Products Inc, Micron Technology Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Rueckheim, Michael) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Netlist, Inc. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael William Tezyan on behalf of Netlist, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9117824. (Tezyan, Michael) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Yanan Zhao on behalf of Netlist, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9116308. (Zhao, Yanan) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Thomas C Werner on behalf of Netlist, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9116203. (Werner, Thomas) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Netlist, Inc.. Micron Semiconductor Products Inc served on 8/3/2022, answer due 8/24/2022. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Hong Annita Zhong on behalf of Netlist, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9056600. (Zhong, Hong) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jason G Sheasby on behalf of Netlist, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9051055. (Sheasby, Jason) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to MICRON TECHNOLOGY TEXAS, LLC through its agent for service The Corporation Service Company,, Micron Semiconductor Products Inc. by and through its agent for service The Corporation Service Company, Micron Technology Inc., by and through its agent for service The Corporation Service Company (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Micron Technology Texas LL, #2 Summons(es) Micron Technology, Inc.)(nkl, ) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Netlist, Inc. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Leigh Truelove on behalf of Netlist, Inc. (Truelove, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9047735.), filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NETLIST, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Natalie L. Arbaugh