Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/09/2021 at 09:27:29 (UTC).

Netbus Inc. v. Pharmavite LLC

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 Netbus Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Pharmavite LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando M. Olguin and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01105

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NETBUS INC.

Defendant

PHARMAVITE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kamran Fattahi

Attorney at Kamran Fattahi Law Offices

15303 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 900

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Defendant Attorneys

Peter B Bromaghim

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson US LLP

12400 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 600

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Carrie J Richey

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson US LLP

1841 Page Mill Road Suite 200

Palo Alto, CA 94304

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Pharmavite LLC, identifying Otsuka America, Inc.; Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.; Otsuka Holdings Co. Ltd.. (Richey, Carrie) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#16

(#16) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 5/6/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#15

(#15) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Dismiss #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Compliance with Local Rule 7.1-1 is required no later than March 8, 2021. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Bromaghim (Lead Counsel) on behalf of Defendant Pharmavite LLC filed by Defendant Pharmavite LLC. (Richey, Carrie) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Carrie J Richey on behalf of Defendant Pharmavite LLC (Attorney Carrie J Richey added to party Pharmavite LLC(pty:dft))(Richey, Carrie) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#11

(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Netbus Inc., upon Defendant Pharmavite LLC served on 2/10/2021, answer due 3/3/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service as agent for service of process of PHARMAVITE LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Fattahi, Kamran) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Pharmavite LLC. (car) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Summons Request #3 filed by plaintiff NETBUS INC.. (Fattahi, Kamran) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff NETBUS INC., (Fattahi, Kamran) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by NETBUS INC.. (Fattahi, Kamran) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#3

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Summons Request #3 filed by plaintiff NETBUS INC.. (Fattahi, Kamran) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff NETBUS INC.. (Fattahi, Kamran) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Dismiss or Stay #14 is taken off the 4/8/2021 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 4/8/2021. An order with the court's ruling will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REPLY in Support of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss or In the Alternative, Stay) #14 (Reply In Support Of Defendant Pharmavite LLCs Motion To Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, Stay) filed by Defendant Pharmavite LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Richey, Carrie) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss or In the Alternative, Stay) #14 filed by Plaintiff Netbus Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fattahi, Kamran) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Pharmavite LLC, identifying Otsuka America, Inc.; Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.; Otsuka Holdings Co. Ltd.. (Richey, Carrie) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 5/6/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Dismiss #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Compliance with Local Rule 7.1-1 is required no later than March 8, 2021. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss or In the Alternative, Stay) filed by Defendant Pharmavite LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/8/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Defendant Pharmavite LLC's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order) (Richey, Carrie) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Bromaghim (Lead Counsel) on behalf of Defendant Pharmavite LLC filed by Defendant Pharmavite LLC. (Richey, Carrie) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Carrie J Richey on behalf of Defendant Pharmavite LLC (Attorney Carrie J Richey added to party Pharmavite LLC(pty:dft))(Richey, Carrie) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Netbus Inc., upon Defendant Pharmavite LLC served on 2/10/2021, answer due 3/3/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service as agent for service of process of PHARMAVITE LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Fattahi, Kamran) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Pharmavite LLC. (car) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Summons Request #3 filed by plaintiff NETBUS INC.. (Fattahi, Kamran) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff NETBUS INC., (Fattahi, Kamran) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by NETBUS INC.. (Fattahi, Kamran) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff NETBUS INC.. (Fattahi, Kamran) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff NETBUS INC.. (Fattahi, Kamran) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30438629 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff NETBUS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-6) (Attorney Kamran Fattahi added to party NETBUS INC.(pty:pla))(Fattahi, Kamran) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHARMAVITE LLC is a litigant