This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/31/2019 at 08:17:39 (UTC).

Nessim v. Association of Apartment Owners of Coconut Plantation

Case Summary

On 11/01/2019 Nessim filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Association of Apartment Owners of Coconut Plantation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH J. MANSFIELD and LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00599

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Referral Judge

KENNETH J. MANSFIELD

Presiding Judge

LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carol Jane Nessim

Defendant

Association of Apartment Owners of Coconut Plantation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy E. Ho

Attorney at Imanaka Asato, LLLC

745 Fort St 17Th Floor

Honolulu, HI 96813

Michael L. Iosua

Attorney at Imanaka Asato, LLLC

745 Fort St 17Th Floor

Honolulu, HI 96813

Steven K.S. Chung

Attorney at Imanaka Asato, LLLC

745 Fort St 17Th Floor, 521-9500, Fax: 541-9050

Honolulu, HI 96813

Defendant Attorney

Dan C. Oyasato

Attorney at Ekimoto & Morris, LLLC

888 Mililani St, 2Nd Floor, 523-0702, Fax: 538-1927

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#5

5 #1

Clerk's Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement

#6

6 #1

Certificate of Service

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 12/20/2019. (jo) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY ENTRY. 12.16 Submission of Proposed Orders. Please be advised that document #7 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings; Order filed by Carol Jane Nessim requires court approval. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the document in word format to the applicable chambers' email address. See Section 10.4 - Emailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations to Chambers, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide for additional instructions and a list of judge's email addresses. (emt, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS by Carol Jane Nessim. (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Association of Apartment Owners of Coconut Plantation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Oyasato, Dan) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 12/30/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement)(apg, ) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00599LEK-KJM on all further pleadings (apg, ) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Carol Jane Nessim Notice of Related Cases Carol Jane Nessim. (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet by Carol Jane Nessim. (Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Association of Apartment Owners of Coconut Plantation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2285426.), filed by Carol Jane Nessim.(Ho, Timothy) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dan C. Oyasato