This case was last updated from PACER on 11/13/2020 at 09:43:26 (UTC).

Nessel et al v. E. I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 Nessel filed an Other lawsuit against E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard M Gergel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-03307

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard M Gergel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dana Nessel

Defendants

Rockwood Systems, Inc.

Verde Environmental, Inc.

Denko, Inc.

Dupont De Nemours Inc

Stevens Company, Inc.

Chemours Company, The

Buckeye Fire Equipment Company

National Foam Inc

Arkema Inc

VST Chemical Corporation

BroCo Products, Inc.

Corteva Inc

Summit Environmental Corporation, Inc.

3M Company

Fire-Ade, Inc.

Fire Service Plus Inc

Dyneon LLC

E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company

Royal Chemical Company

31 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Danielle Allison-Yokom

Attorney at MI Dept Attorney General (ENRA-Lansing)

525 W. Ottawa, 6Th Fl, P.O. Box 30755

Lansing, MI 48909

Amy E. Keller

Attorney at DiCello Levitt Gutzler LLC

Ten North Dearborn St., 6Th Fl.

Chicago, IL 60602

Polly A. Synk

Attorney at MI Dept Attorney General (ENRA-Lansing)

525 W. Ottawa, 6Th Fl, P.O. Box 30755

Lansing, MI 48909

Other Attorneys

Matthew D Thurlow

Attorney at Baker and Hostetler LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue Nw, Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20036-5304

Steven N Geise

Attorney at Jones Day

4655 Executive Drive, Suite 1500

San Diego, CA 92121

Thomas J Heiden

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

330 North Wabash Avenue, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60611

C Wilson DuBose

Attorney at DuBose Massey Bair and Evans

285 N Main St

Madison, GA 30650

Theodore M Grossman

Attorney at Jones Day

250 Vesey Street

New York, NY 10281-1047

Rebekah E Blake

Attorney at Jones Day

250 Vesey Street

New York, NY 10281-1047

Mary Rose Alexander

Attorney at Latham and Watkins LLP

330 North Wabash Avenue, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60611

 

Court Documents

19 #1

Exhibit Agreement

19 #957

(#19) STIPULATION regarding extension of time for defendant to answer or respond to the Complaint by Hazard Control Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreement)(Clerk filed on behalf of attorney filing user)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-03307-RMG(sshe, ) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by C Wilson DuBose on behalf of Hazard Control Technologies, Inc.(Clerk filed on behalf of attorney filing user) Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-03307-RMG(sshe, ) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#16

(#16) STATUS REPORT General Denial and Affirmative Defenses by Perimeter Solutions LP. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-02810-RMG, 2:20-cv-03307-RMG(Thurlow, Matthew) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#15

(#15) STATUS REPORT General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Daikin America Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-03307-RMG(Grossman, Theodore) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven N Geise on behalf of Daikin America Inc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-03307-RMG(Geise, Steven) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Rebekah E Blake on behalf of Daikin America Inc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-03307-RMG(Blake, Rebekah) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J Heiden on behalf of Ecolab Inc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-03307-RMG(Heiden, Thomas) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

7 #1

*Restricted*

#7

No Description Available

#6

(#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; certified copy received from District of South Carolina; case transferred to District of South Carolina under MDL No. 2873, multidistrict (ndj) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 9/18/2020.] (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#5

(#5) COPY of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directed to the District of South Carolina regarding case to be transferred to the Multidistrict Litigation Panel under MDL No. 2873, Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability Litigation Conditional Transfer Order Finalized (ndj) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 9/18/2020.] (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants 3M Company, AGC Chemicals Americas Inc., Amerex Corporation, Angus Fire Armour Corporation, Archroma U.S., Inc., Arkema, Inc., BroCo Products, Inc., Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemguard, Inc., Chemours Company FC, LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, Cobra Fire Protection, Inc., Corteva, Inc., Daikin America, Inc., Dawn Chemical Corporation of Wisconsin, Inc., Denko, Inc., DowDupont, Inc., DuPont De Nemours, Inc., Dyneon, L.L.C., E. I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Ecolab Inc., Fire Service Plus, Inc., Fire-Ade, Inc., G.V.C. Chemical Corporation, Hartford Chemical Sales Corporation, Hazard Control Technologies, Inc., Huntington Laboratories, Inc., Kidde P.L.C., Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, National Foam, Inc., Noble Industrial Supply Corporation, Perimeter Solutions LP, Pioneer Products, Inc., Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Rockwood Systems, Inc., Royal Chemical Company, Russell Martin Industries, Inc., Solvay Specialty Polymers, USA, Stevens Company, Inc., Summit Environmental Corporation, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc., VST Chemical Corporation, Verde Environmental, Inc., Vulcan Fire Systems, Inc. (pjw) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 9/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Keller, Amy) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 9/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (ndj) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 9/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#1

(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Keller, Amy) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 9/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/26/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATION regarding extension of time for defendant to answer or respond to the Complaint by Hazard Control Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreement)(Clerk filed on behalf of attorney filing user)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-03307-RMG(sshe, ) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by C Wilson DuBose on behalf of Hazard Control Technologies, Inc.(Clerk filed on behalf of attorney filing user) Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-03307-RMG(sshe, ) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STATUS REPORT General Denial and Affirmative Defenses by Perimeter Solutions LP. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-02810-RMG, 2:20-cv-03307-RMG(Thurlow, Matthew) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STATUS REPORT General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Daikin America Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-03307-RMG(Grossman, Theodore) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore M Grossman on behalf of Daikin America Inc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-03307-RMG(Grossman, Theodore) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven N Geise on behalf of Daikin America Inc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-03307-RMG(Geise, Steven) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Rebekah E Blake on behalf of Daikin America Inc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-03307-RMG(Blake, Rebekah) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J Heiden on behalf of Ecolab Inc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-03307-RMG(Heiden, Thomas) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Rose Alexander on behalf of Ecolab Inc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:20-cv-03307-RMG(Alexander, Mary Rose) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket(#9) CLERKS NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 This Notice Relates to All Actions. The clerk will be issuing the summons(es) in a timely manner for all amended complaints filed. Due to the volume of amended complaints filed most recently, the clerk will be issuing the summons(es) as follows. Upon receipt of the NEF for the Summons Issued event, please print or download the filed one-page document with the PDF header included, showing the date of issue and civil case (member) number. Insert this dated, signed and sealed document in front of the first page of your prepared summons document, including your supplemental pages, to use for service on defendants. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; certified copy received from District of South Carolina; case transferred to District of South Carolina under MDL No. 2873, multidistrict (ndj) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 9/18/2020.] (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COPY of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directed to the District of South Carolina regarding case to be transferred to the Multidistrict Litigation Panel under MDL No. 2873, Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability Litigation Conditional Transfer Order Finalized (ndj) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 9/18/2020.] (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Polly A. Synk on behalf of plaintiff Dana Nessel and State of Michigan (Synk, Polly) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 9/18/2020.] (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Danielle Allison-Yokom on behalf of plaintiff Dana Nessel and the State of Michigan (Allison-Yokom, Danielle) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 9/18/2020.] (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants 3M Company, AGC Chemicals Americas Inc., Amerex Corporation, Angus Fire Armour Corporation, Archroma U.S., Inc., Arkema, Inc., BroCo Products, Inc., Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemguard, Inc., Chemours Company FC, LLC, The, Chemours Company, The, Cobra Fire Protection, Inc., Corteva, Inc., Daikin America, Inc., Dawn Chemical Corporation of Wisconsin, Inc., Denko, Inc., DowDupont, Inc., DuPont De Nemours, Inc., Dyneon, L.L.C., E. I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company, Ecolab Inc., Fire Service Plus, Inc., Fire-Ade, Inc., G.V.C. Chemical Corporation, Hartford Chemical Sales Corporation, Hazard Control Technologies, Inc., Huntington Laboratories, Inc., Kidde P.L.C., Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, National Foam, Inc., Noble Industrial Supply Corporation, Perimeter Solutions LP, Pioneer Products, Inc., Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Rockwood Systems, Inc., Royal Chemical Company, Russell Martin Industries, Inc., Solvay Specialty Polymers, USA, Stevens Company, Inc., Summit Environmental Corporation, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc., VST Chemical Corporation, Verde Environmental, Inc., Vulcan Fire Systems, Inc. (pjw) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 9/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Keller, Amy) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 9/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to plaintiff Dana Nessel none provided (ndj) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 9/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Michigan, State of, Dana Nessel in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5606642 [Attorney Amy E. Keller added to party Michigan, State of(pty:pla)] (Keller, Amy) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 9/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (ndj) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 9/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Dana Nessel and Michigan, State of (Keller, Amy) Modified text on 8/21/2020 (jlg) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 9/18/2020.] (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rockwood Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BroCo Products, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Dyneon LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Dupont De Nemours Inc is a litigant