This case was last updated from PACER on 08/21/2020 at 12:09:55 (UTC).

Nesbit et al v. Arase et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2020 Nesbit filed an Other - False Claims Act lawsuit against Arase. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cecilia M. Romero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00430

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - False Claims Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cecilia M. Romero

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Paul Nesbit

Barry Wells

Defendants

Susan Arase

Eagle Systems & Services

The Columbia Group

Martin Arase

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason D. Haymore

Attorney at PEARSON BUTLER & CARSON PLLC

1802 W South Jordan Pkwy Ste 200

South Jordan, UT 84095

Dawn W. Emery

Attorney at PEARSON BUTLER PLLC

1802 W South Jordan Pkwy Ste 200

South Jordan, UT 84095

Defendant Attorneys

James Christopher Fontana

Attorney at DEMPSEY FONTANA PLLC

8133 Leesburg Pike Ste 500

Vienna, VA 22182

Louis James D'Agostino, Jr.

Attorney at DEMSPEY FONTANA PLLC

8133 Leesburg Pike Ste 500

Vienna, VA 22182

M. Christopher Moon

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS

215 S State St Ste 760

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Jeffry Ryan Cook

Attorney at DEMPSEY FONTANA PLLC

8133 Leesburg Pl Ste 500

Vienna, VA 22182

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

19 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#19

18 #2

Exhibit B -- Declaration of Martin Arase

18 #1

Exhibit A -- Declaration of Susan Arase

#18

#14

12 #2

Text of Proposed Order

8 #2

Exhibit Letter dated September 19, 2019 to Arase and Perkins

#8

#7

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

#1

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • Docket(#22) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants Martin Arase, Susan Arase, Eagle Systems & Services, The Columbia Group. (alf) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #14 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (alf) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Amended Scheduling Order. The parties shall file a Scheduling Order pursuant to Rule 26(f) within 20 days of the courts order denying the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 8/6/20. (alf) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Joint MOTION for Amended Scheduling Order : to Amend Order to Propose Schedule filed by Defendants Martin Arase, Susan Arase, Eagle Systems & Services, The Columbia Group. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moon, M.) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support , MOTION to Change Venue and Memorandum in Support , MOTION for More Definite Statement and Memorandum in Support /MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE filed by Defendants Martin Arase, Susan Arase, Eagle Systems & Services, The Columbia Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Declaration of Susan Arase, #2 Exhibit B -- Declaration of Martin Arase)(Moon, M.) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Louis James D'Agostino for Martin Arase, Susan Arase, Eagle Systems & Services and The Columbia Group.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 7/30/20. (alf) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James Christopher Fontana for Martin Arase, Susan Arase, Eagle Systems & Services and The Columbia Group.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 7/30/20. (alf) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeffry Ryan Cook for Martin Arase, Susan Arase, Eagle Systems & Services and The Columbia Group.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 7/30/20. (alf) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendants Martin Arase, Susan Arase, Eagle Systems & Services, The Columbia Group, Plaintiffs Paul Nesbit, Barry Wells. Form due by 8/14/2020. (alf) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James Christopher Fontana , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3665007,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Defendants Martin Arase, Susan Arase, Eagle Systems & Services, The Columbia Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moon, M.) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by M. Christopher Moon on behalf of Martin Arase, Susan Arase, Eagle Systems & Services, The Columbia Group (Moon, M.) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Summons and Complaint served on Ellen MacGregor on July 9, 2020, filed by Plaintiff Paul Nesbit. (Emery, Dawn) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ERRATA to #2 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Paul Nesbit and Barry Wells. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email dated September 16, 2019, #2 Exhibit Letter dated September 19, 2019 to Arase and Perkins, #3 Exhibit Email dated July 12, 2019, #4 Exhibit Email dated July 18, 2019, #5 Exhibit Email dated October 21, 2019, #6 Exhibit Email dated October 3, 2019)(Emery, Dawn) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 6/23/20. (alf) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Martin Arase. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kn) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Susan Arase. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kn) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Eagle Systems & Services. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kn) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to The Columbia Group. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kn) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3621176) filed by Paul Nesbit. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Emery, Dawn) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Plaintiffs Paul Nesbit, Barry Wells is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (kn) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Eagle Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason D. Haymore