This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 19:30:22 (UTC).

NEODRON LTD. v. STMICROELECTRONICS N.V., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 NEODRON LTD filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against STMICROELECTRONICS N. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00547

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEODRON LTD.,

Defendants

STMICROELECTRONICS N.V.; ET AL.

STMicroelectronics N.V.

STMicroelectronics, Inc.

STMicroelectronics (North America) Holding, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Amy Hayden

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd. Floor 12

Los Angeles, CA 90025

C. Jay Chung

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Christian W. Conkle

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jonathan Ma

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kristopher R. Davis

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Philip X. Wang

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorneys

Justin S. Cohen

Attorney at Thompson & Knight, LLP

1722 Routh Street, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Massimo Ciccarelli

Attorney at Thompson & Knight LLP

1722 Routh Street, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Nadia Elena Haghighatian

Attorney at Thompson & Knight LLP

1722 Routh St., Ste 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nadia Elena Haghighatian on behalf of STMicroelectronics (North America) Holding, Inc., STMicroelectronics, Inc.. Attorney Nadia Elena Haghighatian added to party STMicroelectronics (North America) Holding, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nadia Elena Haghighatian added to party STMicroelectronics, Inc.(pty:dft) (Haghighatian, Nadia) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Massimo Ciccarelli on behalf of STMicroelectronics (North America) Holding, Inc., STMicroelectronics, Inc.. Attorney Massimo Ciccarelli added to party STMicroelectronics (North America) Holding, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Massimo Ciccarelli added to party STMicroelectronics, Inc.(pty:dft) (Ciccarelli, Massimo) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin S. Cohen on behalf of STMicroelectronics (North America) Holding, Inc., STMicroelectronics, Inc.. Attorney Justin S. Cohen added to party STMicroelectronics (North America) Holding, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Justin S. Cohen added to party STMicroelectronics, Inc.(pty:dft) (Cohen, Justin) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by STMicroelectronics (North America) Holding, Inc., STMicroelectronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ciccarelli, Massimo) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#10

(#10) Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by NEODRON LTD.,. STMicroelectronics (North America) Holding, Inc. served on 6/3/2021, answer due 6/24/2021; STMicroelectronics, Inc. served on 6/3/2021, answer due 6/24/2021. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to STMicroelectronics, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to STMicroelectronics N.V.. (lad) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to STMicroelectronics (North America) Holding, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by NEODRON LTD.,. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by NEODRON LTD., re #1 Complaint, (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT AGAINST STMICROELECTRONICS N.V., STMICROELECTRONICS, INC., AND STMICROELECTRONICS (NORTH AMERICA) HOLDING, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14859404), filed by NEODRON LTD.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: STMicroelectronics (North America) Holding, Inc.and STMicroelectronics, Inc. answer due 8/8/2021. (lad) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. It is hereby ORDERED that, STMicroelectronics, Inc. and STMicroelectronics (North America) Holding, Inc. have until August 8, 2021 to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint for Patent Infringement. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (re) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nadia Elena Haghighatian on behalf of STMicroelectronics (North America) Holding, Inc., STMicroelectronics, Inc.. Attorney Nadia Elena Haghighatian added to party STMicroelectronics (North America) Holding, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nadia Elena Haghighatian added to party STMicroelectronics, Inc.(pty:dft) (Haghighatian, Nadia) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Massimo Ciccarelli on behalf of STMicroelectronics (North America) Holding, Inc., STMicroelectronics, Inc.. Attorney Massimo Ciccarelli added to party STMicroelectronics (North America) Holding, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Massimo Ciccarelli added to party STMicroelectronics, Inc.(pty:dft) (Ciccarelli, Massimo) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin S. Cohen on behalf of STMicroelectronics (North America) Holding, Inc., STMicroelectronics, Inc.. Attorney Justin S. Cohen added to party STMicroelectronics (North America) Holding, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Justin S. Cohen added to party STMicroelectronics, Inc.(pty:dft) (Cohen, Justin) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by STMicroelectronics (North America) Holding, Inc., STMicroelectronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ciccarelli, Massimo) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by NEODRON LTD.,. STMicroelectronics (North America) Holding, Inc. served on 6/3/2021, answer due 6/24/2021; STMicroelectronics, Inc. served on 6/3/2021, answer due 6/24/2021. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to STMicroelectronics, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to STMicroelectronics N.V.. (lad) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to STMicroelectronics (North America) Holding, Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by NEODRON LTD.,. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by NEODRON LTD., re #1 Complaint, (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NEODRON LTD.,. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT AGAINST STMICROELECTRONICS N.V., STMICROELECTRONICS, INC., AND STMICROELECTRONICS (NORTH AMERICA) HOLDING, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14859404), filed by NEODRON LTD.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEODRON LTD., is a litigant

Latest cases where STMICROELECTRONICS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nadia Elena Haghighatian

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justin S. Cohen