This case was last updated from PACER on 08/27/2019 at 08:15:23 (UTC).

NEODRON LTD. v. LENOVO GROUP LTD, et al.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 NEODRON LTD filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against LENOVO GROUP LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00398

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEODRON LTD.,

Defendants

LENOVO GROUP LTD., LENOVO (UNITED STATES) INC., and MOTOROLA MOBILITY LLC,

Motorola Mobility LLC

Lenovo (United States) Inc.

Lenovo Group Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kristopher R. Davis

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Philip X. Wang

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony F, Arguijo

Attorney at Scott Douglass and McConnico LLP

303 Colorado Street, Ste 2400

Austin, TX 78701

Lionel M. Lavenue

Attorney at Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett & Dunner LLP

Two Freedow Square, 11955 Freedom Drive

Reston, VA 21090

Paige Arnette Amstutz

Attorney at Scott, Douglass & McConnico, LLP

303 Colorado Street, Suite 2400

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTICE Defendants' Notice of Related Cases by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Group Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC (Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lionel M. Lavenue on behalf of Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Group Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC (Amstutz, Paige) Modified on 8/26/2019 to correct attorney name in docket text (tr). (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paige Arnette Amstutz on behalf of Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Group Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC (Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#17

(#17) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Group Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC. (Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#16

(#16) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue, or in the Alternative, to Transfer to the Northern District of California by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Group Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC. (Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#15

(#15) ORDER re #12 Stipulation filed by NEODRON LTD. Motorola Mobility LLC answer due 8/23/2019. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER re #13 Stipulation filed by NEODRON LTD. Lenovo (United States) Inc. answer due 8/23/2019. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by NEODRON LTD.,. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by NEODRON LTD.,. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by NEODRON LTD.,. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12295058), filed by NEODRON LTD.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE Defendants' Notice of Related Cases by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Group Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC (Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lionel M. Lavenue on behalf of Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Group Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC (Amstutz, Paige) Modified on 8/26/2019 to correct attorney name in docket text (tr). (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paige Arnette Amstutz on behalf of Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Group Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC (Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Group Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC. (Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue, or in the Alternative, to Transfer to the Northern District of California by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo Group Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC. (Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER re #12 Stipulation filed by NEODRON LTD. Motorola Mobility LLC answer due 8/23/2019. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER re #13 Stipulation filed by NEODRON LTD. Lenovo (United States) Inc. answer due 8/23/2019. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by NEODRON LTD.,. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by NEODRON LTD.,. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristopher R. Davis on behalf of NEODRON LTD.,. Attorney Kristopher R. Davis added to party NEODRON LTD.,(pty:pla) (Davis, Kristopher) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Acknowledgment of Service returned by NEODRON LTD.,. Lenovo (United States) Inc. served on 7/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lad) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Lenovo (United States) Inc. (lad) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Motorola Mobility LLC. (lad) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Lenovo Group Ltd. (lad) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of AO 120 Report form by NEODRON LTD., (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NEODRON LTD.,. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by NEODRON LTD.,. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12295058), filed by NEODRON LTD.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEODRON LTD., is a litigant

Latest cases where MOTOROLA MOBILITY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Lenovo Group is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony F, Arguijo