This case was last updated from PACER on 08/27/2019 at 08:15:19 (UTC).

Neodron, Ltd. v. HP Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 Neodron, Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against HP Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00397

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Neodron, Ltd.

Defendant

HP Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kristopher R. Davis

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Philip X. Wang

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorneys

Robert Williams

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

401 B Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Erin P. Gibson

Attorney at DLA Piper Rudnick Gray Cary US LLP

401 B Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101-4297

Sean C. Cunningham

Attorney at DLA Piper US LLP

401 B St., Ste. 1700

San Diego, CA 92101-4297

David R. Knudson

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

401 B Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Erik R. Fuehrer

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

2000 University Ave.

East Palo Alto, CA 94303-2214

Brian K. Erickson

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

401 Congress, Suite 2500

Austin, TX 78701

John Michael Guaragna

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

401 Congress, Suite 2500

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HP Inc.. (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

22 #1

Proposed Order

#22

(#22) Opposed MOTION to Stay Case Pending ITC Determination by HP Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#21

(#21) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by HP Inc..(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#20

(#20) ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David R. Knudson for HP Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#19

(#19) ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert Williams for HP Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#15

(#20) ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David R. Knudson for HP Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#14

(#19) ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert Williams for HP Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#13

(#18) ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Erik R. Fuehrer for HP Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#21) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by HP Inc..(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HP Inc.. (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Opposed MOTION to Stay Case Pending ITC Determination by HP Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by HP Inc..(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Reset Deadlines: HP Inc. answer due 8/23/2019. (lad) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David R. Knudson for HP Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert Williams for HP Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Erik R. Fuehrer for HP Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sean C. Cunningham for HP Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #8 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Accordingly, Defendant HP Inc.'s deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED until Friday, August 23, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lt) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2019
  • Notice of Correction: re 7 Acknowledgment of Service was changed to Summons Returned Executed to reflect accurate answer date of 7/24/19 instead of 8/2/19. (am) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neodron, Ltd.. HP Inc. served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (am) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Acknowledgment of Service returned by Neodron, Ltd.. HP Inc. served on 7/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lad) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to HP Inc. (lad) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Neodron, Ltd.. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Neodron, Ltd.. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of AO 120 Report Form by Neodron, Ltd. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12295040), filed by Neodron, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEODRON LTD., is a litigant

Latest cases where HP, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristopher R. Davis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip X. Wang