This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2020 at 11:30:20 (UTC).

Neodron Ltd. v. Fujitsu Limited et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2020 Neodron Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Fujitsu Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy S. Payne and Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00239

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Neodron Ltd.

Defendants

Fujitsu Limited

Fujitsu Components America, Inc.

Fujitsu America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat - Los Angeles

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jonathan Ma

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat - Los Angeles

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kent N. Shum

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat - Los Angeles

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Philip X Wang

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat - Los Angeles

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Paul Anthony Kroeger

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat - Los Angeles

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

C. Jay Chung

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat - Los Angeles

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C. Jay Chung on behalf of Neodron Ltd. (Chung, C.) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip X Wang on behalf of Neodron Ltd. (Wang, Philip) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Anthony Kroeger on behalf of Neodron Ltd. (Kroeger, Paul) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kent N. Shum on behalf of Neodron Ltd. (Shum, Kent) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Ma on behalf of Neodron Ltd. (Ma, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

11 #2

Summons(es)

11 #1

Summons(es)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Issued as to Fujitsu America, Inc., Fujitsu Components America, Inc., Fujitsu Limited. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Neodron Ltd. re #1 Complaint, OF RELATED CASES (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Fujitsu America, Inc., Fujitsu Components America, Inc., Fujitsu Limited ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7894453.), filed by Neodron Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C. Jay Chung on behalf of Neodron Ltd. (Chung, C.) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip X Wang on behalf of Neodron Ltd. (Wang, Philip) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Anthony Kroeger on behalf of Neodron Ltd. (Kroeger, Paul) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kent N. Shum on behalf of Neodron Ltd. (Shum, Kent) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Ma on behalf of Neodron Ltd. (Ma, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Issued as to Fujitsu America, Inc., Fujitsu Components America, Inc., Fujitsu Limited. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Neodron Ltd. re #1 Complaint, OF RELATED CASES (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Neodron Ltd. re #1 Complaint, of Lead Attorney (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Neodron Ltd.. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Neodron Ltd. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Fujitsu America, Inc., Fujitsu Components America, Inc., Fujitsu Limited ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7894453.), filed by Neodron Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fujitsu Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where NEODRON LTD., is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Ma