This case was last updated from PACER on 08/11/2020 at 10:45:44 (UTC).

Neodron Ltd. v. Cypress Semiconductor Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/12/2020 Neodron Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00523

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Neodron Ltd.

Defendant

Cypress Semiconductor Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jonathan Ma

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Philip X. Wang

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Paul A. Kroeger

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kent N. Shum

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

C. Jay Chung

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorneys

Oliver J. Richards

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC

12860 El Camino Real, Suite 400

San Diego, CA 92130

David M. Hoffman

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

111 Congress Avenue, Suite 810

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David M. Hoffman on behalf of Oliver J. Richards ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13841188) by on behalf of Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#13

(#13) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Hoffman, David) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation.(Hoffman, David) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C. Jay Chung on behalf of Neodron Ltd.. Attorney C. Jay Chung added to party Neodron Ltd.(pty:pla) (Chung, C.) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

1 #10

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13662800), filed by Neodron Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 08/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David M. Hoffman on behalf of Oliver J. Richards ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13841188) by on behalf of Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Hoffman, David) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation.(Hoffman, David) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C. Jay Chung on behalf of Neodron Ltd.. Attorney C. Jay Chung added to party Neodron Ltd.(pty:pla) (Chung, C.) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Cypress Semiconductor Corporation answer due 8/7/2020. (am) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including August 7, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M. Hoffman on behalf of Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. Attorney David M. Hoffman added to party Cypress Semiconductor Corporation(pty:dft) (Hoffman, David) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neodron Ltd.. Cypress Semiconductor Corporation served on 6/17/2020, answer due 7/8/2020. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. (am) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by Neodron Ltd. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Parties by Neodron Ltd.. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Neodron Ltd.. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13662800), filed by Neodron Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEODRON LTD., is a litigant

Latest cases where Cypress Semiconductor Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Oliver James Richards

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David M. Hoffman