This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 19:29:50 (UTC).

NEODRON LTD. v. CYPRESS SEMICONDUCTOR CORP.

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 NEODRON LTD filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against CYPRESS SEMICONDUCTOR CORP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00545

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEODRON LTD.,

Defendant

CYPRESS SEMICONDUCTOR CORP.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kristopher R. Davis

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Amy Hayden

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd. Floor 12

Los Angeles, CA 90025

C. Jay Chung

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Christian W. Conkle

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jonathan Ma

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Philip X. Wang

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorney

David M. Hoffman

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

111 Congress Avenue, Suite 810

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) CORRECTED MOTION to Stay Case (Unopposed) by CYPRESS SEMICONDUCTOR CORP.,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#12

(#12) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Oliver J. Richards. (lad) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Stay Case Cypress Unopposed Motion to Stay Pending ITC Determination by CYPRESS SEMICONDUCTOR CORP.,. (Richards, Oliver) Terminated pursuant to filing of #13 on 7/8/2021 (lad). (Entered: 07/02/2021)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by CYPRESS SEMICONDUCTOR CORP.,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M. Hoffman on behalf of CYPRESS SEMICONDUCTOR CORP.,. Attorney David M. Hoffman added to party CYPRESS SEMICONDUCTOR CORP.,(pty:dft) (Hoffman, David) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#8

(#8) Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by NEODRON LTD.,. CYPRESS SEMICONDUCTOR CORP., served on 6/3/2021, answer due 6/24/2021. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to CYPRESS SEMICONDUCTOR CORP.,. (lad) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#5

(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT PATENT INFRINGEMENT AGAINST CYPRESS SEMICONDUCTOR CORP ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14859389), filed by NEODRON LTD.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORRECTED MOTION to Stay Case (Unopposed) by CYPRESS SEMICONDUCTOR CORP.,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Oliver J. Richards. (lad) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Stay Case Cypress Unopposed Motion to Stay Pending ITC Determination by CYPRESS SEMICONDUCTOR CORP.,. (Richards, Oliver) Terminated pursuant to filing of #13 on 7/8/2021 (lad). (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by CYPRESS SEMICONDUCTOR CORP.,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, David) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M. Hoffman on behalf of CYPRESS SEMICONDUCTOR CORP.,. Attorney David M. Hoffman added to party CYPRESS SEMICONDUCTOR CORP.,(pty:dft) (Hoffman, David) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by NEODRON LTD.,. CYPRESS SEMICONDUCTOR CORP., served on 6/3/2021, answer due 6/24/2021. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to CYPRESS SEMICONDUCTOR CORP.,. (lad) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NEODRON LTD.,. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by NEODRON LTD., re #1 Complaint, (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by NEODRON LTD.,. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT PATENT INFRINGEMENT AGAINST CYPRESS SEMICONDUCTOR CORP ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14859389), filed by NEODRON LTD.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEODRON LTD., is a litigant

Latest cases where Cypress Semiconductor Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christian W. Conkle

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristopher R. Davis