This case was last updated from PACER on 08/27/2019 at 08:15:09 (UTC).

Neodron, Ltd. v. Amazon.Com, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 Neodron, Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Amazon Com, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00395

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Neodron, Ltd.

Defendant

Amazon.Com, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kristopher R. Davis

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Philip X. Wang

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorney

Stefani E. Shanberg

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street, 32Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

15 #7

Proposed Order Granting Amazon's Mtn for Stay

15 #6

Exhibit 5 to S. Shanberg's Decl. ISO Mtn to Stay

15 #5

Exhibit 4 to S. Shanberg's Decl. ISO Mtn to Stay

15 #4

Exhibit 3 to S. Shanberg's Decl. ISO Mtn to Stay

15 #3

Exhibit 2 to S. Shanberg's Decl. ISO Amazon's Mtn to Stay

15 #2

Exhibit 1 to S. Shanberg's Decl. ISO Amazon's Mtn to Stay

15 #1

Affidavit S. Shanberg Decl. ISO Amazon's Mtn to Stay

#15

(#15) MOTION to Stay Case PENDING DISPOSITION OF RELATED PROCEEDINGS BEFORE THE UNITED STATES INTERNATIONAL TRADE COMMISSION by Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit S. Shanberg Decl. ISO Amazon's Mtn to Stay, #2 Exhibit 1 to S. Shanberg's Decl. ISO Amazon's Mtn to Stay, #3 Exhibit 2 to S. Shanberg's Decl. ISO Amazon's Mtn to Stay, #4 Exhibit 3 to S. Shanberg's Decl. ISO Mtn to Stay, #5 Exhibit 4 to S. Shanberg's Decl. ISO Mtn to Stay, #6 Exhibit 5 to S. Shanberg's Decl. ISO Mtn to Stay, #7 Proposed Order Granting Amazon's Mtn for Stay)(Shanberg, Stefani) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by Amazon.Com, Inc. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#13

(#13) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#12

(#12) DEFENDANT AMAZON.COM, INC.'S ANSWER TO NEODRON LTD.'S COMPLAINT ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Amazon.Com, Inc..(Shanberg, Stefani) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION to Stay Case PENDING DISPOSITION OF RELATED PROCEEDINGS BEFORE THE UNITED STATES INTERNATIONAL TRADE COMMISSION by Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit S. Shanberg Decl. ISO Amazon's Mtn to Stay, #2 Exhibit 1 to S. Shanberg's Decl. ISO Amazon's Mtn to Stay, #3 Exhibit 2 to S. Shanberg's Decl. ISO Amazon's Mtn to Stay, #4 Exhibit 3 to S. Shanberg's Decl. ISO Mtn to Stay, #5 Exhibit 4 to S. Shanberg's Decl. ISO Mtn to Stay, #6 Exhibit 5 to S. Shanberg's Decl. ISO Mtn to Stay, #7 Proposed Order Granting Amazon's Mtn for Stay)(Shanberg, Stefani) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by Amazon.Com, Inc. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Shanberg, Stefani) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) DEFENDANT AMAZON.COM, INC.'S ANSWER TO NEODRON LTD.'S COMPLAINT ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Amazon.Com, Inc..(Shanberg, Stefani) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER re #8 Stipulation filed by Neodron, Ltd. Amazon.Com, Inc. answer due 8/23/2019. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristopher R. Davis on behalf of Neodron, Ltd.. Attorney Kristopher R. Davis added to party Neodron, Ltd.(pty:pla) (Davis, Kristopher) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristopher R. Davis on behalf of Neodron, Ltd. (Davis, Kristopher) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Neodron, Ltd.. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Correction: re #7 Acknowledgment of Service was changed to Summons Returned Executed to reflect accurate answer date of 7/24/19 instead of 8/2/19. (am) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neodron, Ltd.. Amazon.Com, Inc. served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (am) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Acknowledgment of Service returned by Neodron, Ltd.. Amazon.Com, Inc. served on 7/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lad) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Amazon.Com, Inc. (lad) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Neodron, Ltd.. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Neodron, Ltd.. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of AO 120 Report Form by Neodron, Ltd. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12294975), filed by Neodron, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEODRON LTD., is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristopher R. Davis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip X. Wang