This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2022 at 07:06:23 (UTC).

Neo Wireless, LLC v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/15/2022 Neo Wireless, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Marcia Morales Howard and Joel B. Toomey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00780

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia Morales Howard

Referral Judge

Joel B. Toomey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Neo Wireless, LLC

Defendant

Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Howard L. Wernow

Attorney at Sand & Sebolt

4940 Munson Street Nw, Suite 1100

Canton, OH 44718

Jason D. Cassady

Attorney at Caldwell, Cassady & Curry, PC

Suite 100, 2101 Cedar Springs Rd

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan, Transferee court case number: 2:22-cv-11769 MDL case number: 3034; Case transferred electronically (LRB) Modified on 8/1/2022 to correct text only (LRB). (Entered: 08/01/2022)

#8

(#8) RETURN of service executed on 07/19/2022 by Neo Wireless, LLC as to Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#7

(#7) Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (AET) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS issued as to Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (AET) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Neo Wireless, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CFIP NCF Holdings LLC for Neo Wireless, LLC.. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

1 #14

Proposed Summons

1 #13

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #12

Exhibit 12-(Claim 23 of 10771302)

1 #11

Exhibit 11-(Claim 15 of 10965512)

1 #9

Exhibit 9-(Claim 13 of 10,075,941)

1 #8

Exhibit 8-(Claim 11 of 10,833,908))

1 #7

Exhibit 7-(Claim 1 of 8467366)

1 #6

Exhibit 6-US10771302

1 #5

Exhibit 5-US10965512

1 #3

Exhibit 3-US10075941

1 #2

Exhibit 2-US10833908

1 #1

Exhibit 1-US8467366

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT - Transferred case has been opened in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan as case 2:22-cv-11769, filed on 8/2/22. (LRB) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan, Transferee court case number: 2:22-cv-11769 MDL case number: 3034; Case transferred electronically (LRB) Modified on 8/1/2022 to correct text only (LRB). (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN of service executed on 07/19/2022 by Neo Wireless, LLC as to Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (AET) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE to counsel John D. Cassady Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AET) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS issued as to Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (AET) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JW) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • Docket(#3) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:22-cv-00780-MMH-JBT. (APV) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Neo Wireless, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CFIP NCF Holdings LLC for Neo Wireless, LLC.. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19778427) filed by Neo Wireless, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-US8467366, #2 Exhibit 2-US10833908, #3 Exhibit 3-US10075941, #4 Exhibit 4-US10447450, #5 Exhibit 5-US10965512, #6 Exhibit 6-US10771302, #7 Exhibit 7-(Claim 1 of 8467366), #8 Exhibit 8-(Claim 11 of 10,833,908)), #9 Exhibit 9-(Claim 13 of 10,075,941), #10 Exhibit 10-(Claim 7 of 10447450), #11 Exhibit 11-(Claim 15 of 10965512), #12 Exhibit 12-(Claim 23 of 10771302), #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Proposed Summons)(Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Neo Wireless LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCEDES-BENZ USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard L. Wernow