This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2021 at 08:45:07 (UTC).

Nemo-Sabree et al v. Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 Nemo-Sabree filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charmiane G. Claxton and Samuel H. Mays, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02681

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

Presiding Judge

Samuel H. Mays, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LaDawn Nemo-Sabree

Breanne Parshall

Defendant

Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Barszcz

Attorney at Lytle & Barszcz, P.A.

533 Versailles Drive2Nd Floor

Maitland, FL 32751

Mary Lytle

Attorney at Lytle & Barszcz, P.A.

533 Versailles Drive2Nd Floor

Maitland, FL 32751-4257

Defendant Attorneys

Robin A Wofford

Attorney at WILSON TURNER KOSMO LLP

402 West Broadwaysuite 1600

San Diego, CA 92101

Leticia Butler

Attorney at WILSON TURNER KOSMO LLP

402 West Broadwaysuite 1600

San Diego, CA 92101

Lois Kosch

Attorney at WILSON TURNER KOSMO LLP

402 West Broadwaysuite 1600

San Diego, CA 92101

Meryl Maneker

Attorney at WILSON TURNER KOSMO LLP

402 West Broadwaysuite 1600

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Lytle, Mary) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#32

(#32) ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 12/21/2021. (Mays, Samuel) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#31

(#31) ORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 12/21/21. (Mays, Samuel) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

28 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-Central District of California

28 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-State Bar of California

28 #28

Main Document

27 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-Central District of California

27 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-State Bar of California

27 #27

Main Document

#7

(#7) Certificate of Good Standing Middle District of Florida - Barszcz by All Plaintiffs. (Lytle, Mary) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Good Standing Middle District of Florida - Lytle by All Plaintiffs. (Lytle, Mary) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by LaDawn Nemo-Sabree, Breanne Parshall Consent to Sue and Opt-In - Malcolm Beaty (Lytle, Mary) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by LaDawn Nemo-Sabree, Breanne Parshall Consent to Sue and Opt-In - LaDawn Nemo-Sabree (Lytle, Mary) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by LaDawn Nemo-Sabree, Breanne Parshall Consent to Sue and Opt-In - Dodie Wendt (Lytle, Mary) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by LaDawn Nemo-Sabree, Breanne Parshall Consent to Sue and Opt-In - Breanne Parshall (Lytle, Mary) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

1 #2

Summons for Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3736617), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.)(Lytle, Mary) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Lytle, Mary) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 12/21/2021. (Mays, Samuel) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 12/21/21. (Mays, Samuel) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 12/21/2021. (Mays, Samuel) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 12/21/2021. (Mays, Samuel) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Proposed Order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number BTNWDC-3773595) by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-State Bar of California, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-Central District of California)(Maneker, Meryl) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Proposed Order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3773561) by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-State Bar of California, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-Central District of California)(Kosch, Lois) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Proposed Order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3773520) by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-State Bar of California, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-Central District of California)(Wofford, Robin) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Proposed Order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3773487) by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-State Bar of California, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-Central District of California)(Butler, Leticia) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Breanne Parshall, LaDawn Nemo-Sabree. All Defendants. (Lytle, Mary) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3736686) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Middle District of Florida Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing)(Lytle, Mary) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Good Standing Supreme Court - Barszcz by All Plaintiffs. (Lytle, Mary) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Good Standing Supreme Court - Lytle by All Plaintiffs. (Lytle, Mary) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Good Standing Middle District of Florida - Barszcz by All Plaintiffs. (Lytle, Mary) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Good Standing Middle District of Florida - Lytle by All Plaintiffs. (Lytle, Mary) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by LaDawn Nemo-Sabree, Breanne Parshall Consent to Sue and Opt-In - Malcolm Beaty (Lytle, Mary) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by LaDawn Nemo-Sabree, Breanne Parshall Consent to Sue and Opt-In - LaDawn Nemo-Sabree (Lytle, Mary) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by LaDawn Nemo-Sabree, Breanne Parshall Consent to Sue and Opt-In - Dodie Wendt (Lytle, Mary) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by LaDawn Nemo-Sabree, Breanne Parshall Consent to Sue and Opt-In - Breanne Parshall (Lytle, Mary) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3736617), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.)(Lytle, Mary) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. THIRD-PARTY ADMINISTRATOR INSURED BY is a litigant