This case was last updated from PACER on 06/08/2020 at 18:14:21 (UTC).

Nemetz et al v. Air Canada

Case Summary

On 04/09/2020 Nemetz filed a Personal Injury - Airplane lawsuit against Air Canada. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Allison D. Burroughs. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-10700

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Airplane

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Allison D. Burroughs

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Robert Nemetz

Susan Nemetz

Defendant

Air Canada

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Louis J. Muggeo

133 Washington Street

Salem, MA 01970

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Susan Nemetz, Robert Nemetz. Air Canada waiver sent on 4/17/2020, answer due 7/16/2020. (Muggeo, Louis) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Air Canada. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Susan Nemetz & Robert Nemetz against Air Canada Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8189954 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Robert Nemetz, Susan Nemetz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Muggeo, Louis) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Susan Nemetz, Robert Nemetz. Air Canada waiver sent on 4/17/2020, answer due 7/16/2020. (Muggeo, Louis) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Air Canada. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Susan Nemetz & Robert Nemetz against Air Canada Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8189954 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Robert Nemetz, Susan Nemetz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Muggeo, Louis) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less