This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/20/2020 at 08:33:25 (UTC).

NELSON v. VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 NELSON filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JUAN R. SANCHEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05467

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAN R. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERNEST NELSON

Defendants

VERIZON SERVICES CORP.

VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRAHAM F. BAIRD

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ERIC A. SHORE PC

Two Penn Center, 1500 John F Kennedy Blvd Suite 1240

Philadelphia, PA 19110

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ERNEST NELSON. VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, LLC waiver sent on 11/27/2019, answer due 1/26/2020. (BAIRD, GRAHAM) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, VERIZON SERVICES CORP. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE207169.), filed by ERNEST NELSON.(bw, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ERNEST NELSON. VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, LLC waiver sent on 11/27/2019, answer due 1/26/2020. (BAIRD, GRAHAM) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • 2 Summons Issued as to VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, VERIZON SERVICES CORP.. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 11/21/2019 (bw, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ERNEST NELSON. (bw, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, VERIZON SERVICES CORP. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE207169.), filed by ERNEST NELSON.(bw, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Verizon Services Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Graham F. Baird