This case was last updated from PACER on 09/10/2021 at 09:06:25 (UTC).

Nelson v. U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services et al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 Nelson filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against U S Citizenship Immigration Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Greg Kays. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00487

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Greg Kays

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Peter John Nelson

Defendants

U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services

Terri Robinson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward Dean Greim

Attorney at Graves Garrett, LLC - KCMO

1100 Main St., Ste. 2700

Kansas City, MO 64105

Carl W. Hampe

1101 15Th St., Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20005

Daniel Pierce

Attorney at Fragomen

1101 15Th St, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20005

Samantha Anne Caesar

Attorney at Fragomen

1101 15Th St., Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Order of Dismissal. Signed on 8/12/2021 by District Judge Greg Kays. (law clerk) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Order of Dismissal. Signed on 8/12/2021 by District Judge Greg Kays. (law clerk) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Peter John Nelson (Greim, Edward) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Peter John Nelson. Terri Robinson served on 7/16/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Pierce, Daniel) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Peter John Nelson. U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services served on 7/16/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (Pierce, Daniel) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #5 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Carl W. Hampe for Peter John Nelson allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #4 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Daniel Pierce for Peter John Nelson allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #3 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Samantha Caesar for Peter John Nelson allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to allow Carl W. Hampe to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7493023) filed by Edward Dean Greim on behalf of Peter John Nelson. (Greim, Edward) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion to allow Daniel Pierce to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7493016) filed by Edward Dean Greim on behalf of Peter John Nelson. (Greim, Edward) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion to allow Samantha Anne Caesar to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7493007) filed by Edward Dean Greim on behalf of Peter John Nelson. (Greim, Edward) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Docket(#2) Documents, Notice of Inclusion for Mediation and Assessment Program and MAP General Order, were deleted as they were entered in error. NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: # 1 MAP General Order)(Crocker, Susan) Modified on 7/14/2021 to delete documents (Crocker, Susan). (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Terri Robinson, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Crocker, Susan) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Terri Robinson, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services filed by Edward Dean Greim on behalf of Peter John Nelson. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7491308. Service due by 10/12/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Greim, Edward) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US Citizenship and Immigration Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carl W Hampe

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward D. Greim