This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2020 at 10:37:31 (UTC).

Nelson v. Saul

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 Nelson filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Willie J. Epps, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-03297

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Willie J. Epps, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James A. Nelson

Springfield, MO 65801

Defendant

Andrew M. Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OGCSSAR7

Attorney at Office of General Counsel-SSA Region 7

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. A copy of this Order has been mailed to the plaintiff. Signed on 09/24/2020 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. (Geiser, Angel) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Magistrate Assignment Returned by Plaintiff, James A. Nelson and Defendant, Andrew M. Saul. Jurisdiction by magistrate accepted. ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent)(Berner, Crystal) Modified on 10/13/2020 to reflect NEF mailed to James A. Nelson at PO Box 9711 Springfield, MO 65801 (Berner, Crystal). (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT as to all parties: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 10/15/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court.(NEF and Notice of Magistrate Assignment mailed to pro se plaintiff Nelson.)(Siegert, Karen) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT James A. Nelson. (Filing fee $400 receipt number IFP) Service due by 12/23/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). Copy of NEF and Complaint mailed to pro se plaintiff. (Siegert, Karen) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. A copy of this Order has been mailed to the plaintiff. Signed on 09/24/2020 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. (Geiser, Angel) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRO SE MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by James A. Nelson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/8/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Financial Status, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Siegert, Karen) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less