Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/23/2020 at 10:54:50 (UTC).

Nelson v. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois

Case Summary

On 06/24/2020 Nelson filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan P. Watters and Timothy J. Cavan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00092

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan P. Watters

Referral Judge

Timothy J. Cavan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Travis Nelson

Defendant

Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael F. McGuinness

Attorney at PATTEN PETERMAN BEKKEDAHL & GREEN, PLLC

2817 Second Ave North, Suite 300

Billings, MT 59101

Defendant Attorney

Brooke B. Murphy

Attorney at MURPHYMYERS, PLLC

2817 Montana Ave., Suite 220, P.O. Box 11619

Billings, MT 59103-1619

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Murphy, Brooke) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#12

(#12) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Travis Nelson. (McGuinness, Michael) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#11

(#11) STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Travis Nelson. (McGuinness, Michael) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#10

(#10) JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Travis Nelson. (McGuinness, Michael) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#9

(#9) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 8/20/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 8/20/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 8/20/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2020 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. See order for call-in information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 7/9/2020. (HEG) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

#8

(#8) Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan (JDR) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #6 Complaint filed in State Court with Jury Demand by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (JDR) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#6

(#6) COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, filed by Travis Nelson. (JDR) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

5 #2

File Receipt

5 #1

State Court File

#5

(#5) STATE COURT FILE: DV-20-0781, MT 13th Judicial District Court, Yellowstone County. (Attachments: #1 State Court File, #2 File Receipt) (JDR) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#4

(#4) CONSENTS TO USMJ. (JDR) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#3

(#3) Mailing of Consent - Honorable Timothy Cavan as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel Michael F. McGuinness, Brooke B. Murphy. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 7/13/2020. (ACC) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois identifying Corporate Parent Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois for Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois.. (Murphy, Brooke) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

State Court Pleadings

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Murphy, Brooke) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Travis Nelson. (McGuinness, Michael) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Travis Nelson. (McGuinness, Michael) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Travis Nelson. (McGuinness, Michael) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 8/20/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 8/20/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 8/20/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2020 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. See order for call-in information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 7/9/2020. (HEG) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan (JDR) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #6 Complaint filed in State Court with Jury Demand by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (JDR) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, filed by Travis Nelson. (JDR) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATE COURT FILE: DV-20-0781, MT 13th Judicial District Court, Yellowstone County. (Attachments: #1 State Court File, #2 File Receipt) (JDR) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENTS TO USMJ. (JDR) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Mailing of Consent - Honorable Timothy Cavan as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel Michael F. McGuinness, Brooke B. Murphy. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 7/13/2020. (ACC) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois identifying Corporate Parent Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois for Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois.. (Murphy, Brooke) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2500689. (JEH) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois from MT 13th Judicial District Court, case number DV-20-0781. filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JEH) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Safeco Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael F. McGuinness