Nelson v. Robinhood Financial LLC et al

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., ROBINHOOD SECURITIES, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23727947)Document filed by BRENDON NELSON..(Cabeceiras, Alexander) Modified on 1/29/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Alexander Gabriel Cabeceiras to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Alexander Gabriel Cabeceiras. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Alexander Gabriel Cabeceiras. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code Contempt Proceedings;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1331;. (jgo) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Alexander Gabriel Cabeceiras. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: BRENDON NELSON; ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC; ROBINHOOD SECURITIES, LLC; ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/18/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/29/2021) (ks) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. Document filed by Brendon Nelson..(Cabeceiras, Alexander) (Entered: 01/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cabeceiras, Alexander) (Entered: 01/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ROBINHOOD FINANCIAL LLC, ROBINHOOD SECURITIES, LLC, ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Brendon Nelson..(Cabeceiras, Alexander) (Entered: 01/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC..(dnh) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Robinhood Financial LLC waiver sent on 2/3/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Robinhood Markets, Inc. waiver sent on 2/3/2021, answer due 4/5/2021; Robinhood Securities, LLC waiver sent on 2/3/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. Document filed by Brendon Nelson..(Cabeceiras, Alexander) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE AS A PLAINTIFF.Document filed by April Miller, a non-party.(sc) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: denying without prejudice to renewal #8 Motion to Intervene. On February 5, 2021, non-party April Miller, proceeding without counsel, moved to intervene as a plaintiff in this case. ECF No. 8. Although the motion references a "Brief in Support... attached," the only supporting documentation provided appears to be unidentified and unauthenticated screenshots from a cellphone. Because Ms. Miller provides no legal authority or cognizable evidence in support of her motion, it is DENIED without prejudice to renewal with appropriate supporting authority and documentation. Separately, on February 4, 2021, Defendants waived service of process, making their deadline to answer or respond to the Complaint is April 5, 2021. ECF No. 7. In light of that, the initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for March 18, 2021 is ADJOURNED to April 15, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 8 and to mail a copy of this Order to Ms. Miller. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/09/2021) (ama) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Robinhood Financial LLC answer due 4/5/2021; Robinhood Markets, Inc. answer due 4/5/2021; Robinhood Securities, LLC answer due 4/5/2021., Set/Reset Hearings:( Initial Conference set for 4/15/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (ama) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before February 24, 2021, Plaintiff shall amend his Complaint to allege the citizenship of each constituent person or entity comprising the Defendant LLC's (If Plaintiff determines that all Defendants are, in fact, corporations, notwithstanding their names, it shall file a letter to that effect by no later than the same date). SO ORDERED., ( Amended Pleadings due by 2/24/2021.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/10/2021) (ama) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caroline Hope Miller on behalf of Brandon Nelson..(Miller, Caroline) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. Document filed by BENEDICT WONG, STEFFON DUNLOP, ALAA KHOURY, NICHOLAS BOGAN..(Cabeceiras, Alexander) Modified on 2/25/2021 (dnh). (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) COMPLAINT against Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. Document filed by STEFFON DUNLOP, NICHOLAS BOGAN, BENEDICT WONG, Brandon Nelson, ALAA KHOURY..(Cabeceiras, Alexander) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Seamus Barrett on behalf of NICHOLAS BOGAN, STEFFON DUNLOP, ALAA KHOURY, Brandon Nelson, BENEDICT WONG..(Barrett, Seamus) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to answer, move to dismiss or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Kevin J. Orsini dated March 9, 2021. Document filed by Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC..(Orsini, Kevin) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for April 15, 2021 is ADJOURNED to May 6, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 15. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/9/2021) (js) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 5/6/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (js) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Robinhood Financial LLC answer due 4/30/2021; Robinhood Markets, Inc. answer due 4/30/2021; Robinhood Securities, LLC answer due 4/30/2021. (js) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less