This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2019 at 07:16:18 (UTC).

Nelson v. Gerber Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/09/2019 Nelson filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Gerber Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey U. Beaverstock and William E. Cassady. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00340

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey U. Beaverstock

Referral Judge

William E. Cassady

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Wynonna Angelyn Nelson

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Gerber Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark C. Wolfe

Attorney at Boteler, Finley & Wolfe

3290 Dauphin Street, Suite 505

Mobile, AL 36606

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jason Allen Walters

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings

1926 3Rd Avenue North, Apartment 302

Birmingham, AL 35203

Kriston Laney gifford

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings

One Federal Place, 1819 Fifth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Kriston Laney gifford on behalf of Gerber Life Insurance Company (gifford, Kriston) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#6

(#6) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Walters, Jason) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

3 #1

Consent Form

#3

(#3) PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 7/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (tgw) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Gerber Life Insurance Company, Western & Southern Financial Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Western & Southern Financial Group, Inc. for Gerber Life Insurance Company.. (Walters, Jason) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

1 #16

Exhibit P - Order Granting Motion to Withdraw

1 #14

Exhibit N - Protective Order

1 #11

Exhibit K - Motion for Protective Order

1 #10

Exhibit J - Order Granting Motion to Strike

1 #9

Exhibit I - Proposed Order on Motion to Strike

1 #8

Exhibit H - Notice of Hearing

1 #7

Exhibit G - Motion to Dismiss/Strike

1 #6

Exhibit F - Answer to Counterclaim

1 #5

Exhibit E - Answer and Counterclaim

1 #4

Exhibit D - Return of Service

1 #3

Exhibit C - Complaint and Written Discovery

1 #2

Exhibit B - Docket Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Index to State Court File

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Kriston Laney gifford on behalf of Gerber Life Insurance Company (gifford, Kriston) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Order re: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Gerber Life Insurance Company. Scheduling Conference (by telephone) RESCHEDULED for 9/12/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady. To access the conference, the parties shall use the following numbers: CALL IN 877-873-8018 ACCESS CODE 3291819. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/3/2019. (eec) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • (#8) Order re: 7 Order. Scheduling Conference (by telephone) RESCHEDULED for 9/5/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady. To access the conference, the parties shall use the following numbers: CALL IN 877-873-8018 ACCESS CODE 3291819. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 8/29/2019. (eec) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Order re: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Gerber Life Insurance Company, Scheduling Conference (by telephone) set for 9/3/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady. To access the conference, the parties shall use the following numbers: CALL IN 877-873-8018 ACCESS CODE 3291819. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/26/2019. (eec) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REFERRAL OF #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Cassady. (cmj) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Walters, Jason) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by Gerber Life Insurance Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by Gerber Life Insurance Company (Cassady, William) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 7/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (tgw) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Gerber Life Insurance Company, Western & Southern Financial Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Western & Southern Financial Group, Inc. for Gerber Life Insurance Company.. (Walters, Jason) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gerber Life Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Mobile County, case number 02-CV-2019-900006. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2427576, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Gerber Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index to State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Complaint and Written Discovery, #4 Exhibit D - Return of Service, #5 Exhibit E - Answer and Counterclaim, #6 Exhibit F - Answer to Counterclaim, #7 Exhibit G - Motion to Dismiss/Strike, #8 Exhibit H - Notice of Hearing, #9 Exhibit I - Proposed Order on Motion to Strike, #10 Exhibit J - Order Granting Motion to Strike, #11 Exhibit K - Motion for Protective Order, #12 Exhibit L - Interim Order, #13 Exhibit M - Proposed Protective Order, #14 Exhibit N - Protective Order, #15 Exhibit O - Motion to Withdraw, #16 Exhibit P - Order Granting Motion to Withdraw, #17 Exhibit Q - Settlement Demand, #18 Civil Cover Sheet) (Walters, Jason) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.