This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/10/2021 at 09:15:31 (UTC).

Nelson v. Dungelyan et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 Nelson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Dungelyan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Martin L.C. Feldman and Dana Douglas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00510

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin L.C. Feldman

Referral Judge

Dana Douglas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chlynethia Nelson

New Orleans, LA 70113

Defendants

YJ Transportation, Inc.

Kop Dungelyan

RRS Trucking, Inc.

American Sentinel Insurance Company

Crusader Insurance Company

JY Trucking, LLC

YJ Trucking, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patrick G. Kehoe, Jr.

Attorney at Patrick G. Kehoe, Jr., APLC

3524 Canal Street

New Orleans, LA 70119

Defendant Attorneys

Campbell Edington Wallace

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Ivana Dillas

Attorney at Frilot, L.L.C.

1100 Poydras Street, Ste 3800

New Orleans, LA 70163

Darrin L. Forte

Attorney at Garrison, Yount, Forte & Mulcahy, LLC (New Orleans)

909 Poydras Street, Suite 1800

New Orleans, LA 70112

Nicholas Leehy

Attorney at Garrison, Yount, Forte & Mulcahy

909 Poydras Street, Ste. 1800

New Orleans, LA 70112

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit Original Petition for Damages

1 #2

Exhibit First Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages

1 #3

Exhibit All Defendants Consent to Removal

1 #4

Exhibit Party Citizenship

1 #5

Exhibit Party Citizenship

1 #6

Exhibit Party Citizenship

1 #7

Exhibit Party Citizenship

1 #8

Exhibit In Globo State Court Documents

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#4

4 #1

Exhibit Certificate of State Court Records/State Court Filings

#5

#6

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER - It having come to the Court's attention that Civil Action No. 21-510, Section F (3) is related to 21-509, Section F(3); IT IS ORDERED that the matters are CONSOLIDATED. Pursuant to the Court's directive, all pleadings hereafter filed in this consolidated proceeding shall bear the caption of the lead consolidated case together with the docket number of all cases within the consolidation to which the document applies or the notation "ALL CASES" if it applies to all cases. All entries shall be made on the master docket sheet only, with a notation listing the cases to which the document applies. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 3/31/2021. (Ref: 21-509, 21-510) (sa) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Judge Greg Gerard Guidry, Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 03/29/2021. (NEF: Sec. T, F, Mag. 1, 3)(ko) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Compliance by American Sentinel Insurance Company, YJ Transportation, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of State Court Records/State Court Filings)(Dillas, Ivana) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by American Sentinel Insurance Company. By the Clerk. (bm) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (go) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court Parish of Jefferson, case number 811-754 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8772497) filed by American Sentinel Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit First Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages, #3 Exhibit All Defendants Consent to Removal, #4 Exhibit Party Citizenship, #5 Exhibit Party Citizenship, #6 Exhibit Party Citizenship, #7 Exhibit Party Citizenship, #8 Exhibit In Globo State Court Documents, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Campbell Edington Wallace added to party American Sentinel Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Wallace, Campbell) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/12/2021) (bm). (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YJ Transportation, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CRUSADER INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick G. Kehoe, Jr.