This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/22/2022 at 08:04:36 (UTC).

Nelson v. Crown Asset Management, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/23/2022 Nelson filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Crown Asset Management, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Martha M. Pacold. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01514

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martha M. Pacold

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Georgina Nelson

Defendant

Crown Asset Management, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Scott Davidson

Attorney at Law Offices of Joseph P. Doyle, LLC

105 South Roselle Road, Suite 203

Schaumburg, IL 60193

Defendant Attorneys

David M Schultz

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 North Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Jennifer W. Weller

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 N. Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Georgina Nelson; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19273439. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Georgina Nelson by Joseph Scott Davidson (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Georgina Nelson as to Crown Asset Management, LLC on 4/11/2022, answer due 5/2/2022. (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Initial Status Report outline

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Crown Asset Management, LLC by Jennifer W. Weller (Weller, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Crown Asset Management, LLC by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#7

(#7) MOTION by Defendant Crown Asset Management, LLC for extension of time to file answer (UNOPPOSED) (Weller, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Initial Joint Status Report Outline

#9

(#9) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Crown Asset Management, LLC (Weller, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Crown Asset Management, LLC (Weller, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Defendant's unopposed motion for enlargement of time #7 is granted. Defendant to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint by 5/25/2022. The parties are given until 5/27/2022 to file an initial joint status report. (Attachments: #1 Initial Joint Status Report Outline) (rao, ) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Defendant Crown Asset Management, LLC for extension of time to file answer (UNOPPOSED) (Weller, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Crown Asset Management, LLC by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Crown Asset Management, LLC by Jennifer W. Weller (Weller, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file an initial joint status report by 5/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, ) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Georgina Nelson as to Crown Asset Management, LLC on 4/11/2022, answer due 5/2/2022. (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Crown Asset Management, LLC (ey, ) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (dxb, ) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, ) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Georgina Nelson by Joseph Scott Davidson (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Georgina Nelson; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19273439. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crown Asset Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Weller

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David M. Schultz