This case was last updated from PACER on 07/28/2020 at 14:34:30 (UTC).

Nelson v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 05/29/2020 Nelson filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark A Roberts and Linda R Reade. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-02035

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark A Roberts

Presiding Judge

Linda R Reade

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sari Nelson

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert J Engler

Attorney at Cambridge Law Firm PLC

707 Poplar Street, Po Box 496, ***Ecf

Atlantic, IA 50022

Karl E Osterhout

Attorney at Osterhout Disability Law LLC

521 Cedar Way, Suite 200

Oakmont, PA 15139

Defendant Attorneys

Jacob A Schunk

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

111 7Th Avenue Se, Box 1, Ecf

Cedar Rapids, IA 52401

Chris Carillo

Attorney at Social Security Administration

Office Of General Counsel - Suite 340, 1301 Young Street, Mailroom 104

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk is ordered to file the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 6/3/20. (ksy) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sari Nelson (Osterhout, Karl) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Chris Carillo on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Carillo, Chris) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob A Schunk on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Schunk, Jacob) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 SS New Case Packet) (ksy) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Sari Nelson. Dismissal Deadline 9/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ksy) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk is ordered to file the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts on 6/3/20. (ksy) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) *TEXT ORDER ONLY* granting #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Karl E Osterhout (Pro Hac Vice Fee $100 receipt number AIANDC-3211164) on behalf of Plaintiff Sari Nelson: Upon review of the motion and certificate of good standing, the court finds the motion should be granted. It is so ordered that Attorney Karl E Osterhout is authorized to appear on behalf of Plaintiff Sari Nelson. Signed by Clerk on 6/1/2020. (pac) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Karl E. Osterhout ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3211164) by Plaintiff Sari Nelson (Attachments: #1 CGS WD PA - WD PA) (Osterhout, Karl) (Entered: 05/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudge Linda R Reade and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Mark A Roberts. (des) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Sari Nelson (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Engler, Robert) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacob A Schunk

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chris Carillo