This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/09/2021 at 10:40:17 (UTC).

Nelson v. Boston Scientific Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 Nelson filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Boston Scientific Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Terrence W. Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-00020

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terrence W. Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Catherine Nelson

Defendant

Boston Scientific Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher James Anglin

Attorney at Anglin Law Firm, PLLC

3824 Barrett Dr., Suite 301

Raleigh, NC 27609

Rebecca L. Fredona

Attorney at Moll Law Group

22 W. Washington, 15Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorney

Leslie C. Packer

Attorney at Ellis & Winters LLP

4131 Parklake Avenue,, Suite 400

Raleigh, NC 27612

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting the Joint Motion for Extension of Time #11 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including June 8, 2021, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/8/2021. (Hockaday, A.) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Packer, Leslie) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Appearance filed by Leslie C. Packer on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Packer, Leslie) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Catherine Nelson. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver sent on 2/8/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. (Fredona, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Rebecca L. Fredona on behalf of Catherine Nelson. (Fredona, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher James Anglin on behalf of Catherine Nelson. (Anglin, Christopher) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Boston Scientific Corporation. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - All Counsel shall file their own Notice of Appearance or Notice of Special Appearance to ensure their name is added to the docket to receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEF's). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Christopher James Anglin on behalf of Catherine Nelson. (Anglin, Christopher) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Financial Disclosure Statement by Catherine Nelson (Anglin, Christopher) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice filed by Catherine Nelson regarding #1 Complaint Summons. (Anglin, Christopher) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice filed by Catherine Nelson regarding #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet. (Anglin, Christopher) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Boston Scientific Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-5867156.), filed by Catherine Nelson. (Anglin, Christopher) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boston Scientific Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTOPHER JAMES ANGLIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca Laine Fredona