This case was last updated from PACER on 03/29/2021 at 09:11:29 (UTC).

Nelson v. Bethlehem Haulage LLC

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 Nelson filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Bethlehem Haulage LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR and HENRY S. PERKIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00408

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR

HENRY S. PERKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kirk Nelson

Defendant

Bethlehem Haulage LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL J. FIORILLO

Attorney at FIORILLO LAW OFFICES

217 Mahantongo Street

Pottsville, PA 17901

Defendant Attorneys

EILEEN K KEEFE

Three Parkway, 1601 Cherry Street, Suite 1350

Philadelphia, PA 19102

EILEEN KEEFE

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS P.C.

Three Parkway, 1601 Cherry Street, Ste. 1350

Philadelphia, PA 19102

JOHN SCULL

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS PC

1601 Cherry St Sutie 1350

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) CONSENT AND ORDER TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE OF 3/24/21 THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: HENRY S. PERKIN TO CONDUCT ALL PROCEEDINGS AND ORDER THE ENTRY OF A FINAL JUDGMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH 28 U.S.C. 636(c) AND FRCP 73. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON JR ON 3/24/21. 3/24/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#15

(#15) NOTICE re: Cancellation of Hearing. Re: March 29, 2021 Rule 16 Pretrial Conference. (dt, ) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#14

(#14) Disclosure with Certificate of Service by Kirk Nelson.(FIORILLO, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF INITIAL FED.R.CIV.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: AN INITIAL FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR MONDAY, MARCH 29, 2021, AT 3:00 P.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. VIA TELEPHONE. COUNSEL WILL BE PROVIDED WITH CALL-IN INFORMATION BY EMAIL.(dja, ) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN SCULL on behalf of Bethlehem Haulage LLC with Certificate of Service(SCULL, JOHN) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

#11

(#11) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by Bethlehem Haulage LLC.(KEEFE, EILEEN) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by Bethlehem Haulage LLC.(KEEFE, EILEEN) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF[S] MUST SERVE THIS ORDER ON EVERY PARTY TO THIS CASE IMMEDIATELY AFTER THE PARTYS FIRST APPEARANCE, UNLESS THIS CASE WAS REMOVED FROM STATE COURT, IN WHICH CASE THIS RESPONSIBILITY FALLS ON COUNSEL FOR THE PARTY WHO REMOVED THE CASE; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 1/29/21. 1/29/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, ) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

8 #1

*Restricted*

#8

(#8) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 3:20-cv-02302. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Transfer Venue. This action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the case in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 1/28/21 (jam) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/29/2021.] (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Concurrence by Bethlehem Haulage LLC re #5 MOTION to Transfer Case . (Keefe, Eileen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/29/2021.] (Entered: 01/27/2021)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) MOTION to Transfer Case by Bethlehem Haulage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Keefe, Eileen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/29/2021.] (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#4

(#4) Order approving #3 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead. Time extended by 60 days, through and including 2/15/21. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 12/16/10. (jam) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/29/2021.] (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#3

(#3) STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead by Bethlehem Haulage LLC. (Keefe, Eileen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/29/2021.] (Entered: 12/15/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CONSENT AND ORDER TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE OF 3/24/21 THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: HENRY S. PERKIN TO CONDUCT ALL PROCEEDINGS AND ORDER THE ENTRY OF A FINAL JUDGMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH 28 U.S.C. 636(c) AND FRCP 73. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOSEPH F. LEESON JR ON 3/24/21. 3/24/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE re: Cancellation of Hearing. Re: March 29, 2021 Rule 16 Pretrial Conference. (dt, ) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Disclosure with Certificate of Service by Kirk Nelson.(FIORILLO, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF INITIAL FED.R.CIV.P. 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: AN INITIAL FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR MONDAY, MARCH 29, 2021, AT 3:00 P.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. VIA TELEPHONE. COUNSEL WILL BE PROVIDED WITH CALL-IN INFORMATION BY EMAIL.(dja, ) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN SCULL on behalf of Bethlehem Haulage LLC with Certificate of Service(SCULL, JOHN) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by Bethlehem Haulage LLC.(KEEFE, EILEEN) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by Bethlehem Haulage LLC.(KEEFE, EILEEN) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF[S] MUST SERVE THIS ORDER ON EVERY PARTY TO THIS CASE IMMEDIATELY AFTER THE PARTYS FIRST APPEARANCE, UNLESS THIS CASE WAS REMOVED FROM STATE COURT, IN WHICH CASE THIS RESPONSIBILITY FALLS ON COUNSEL FOR THE PARTY WHO REMOVED THE CASE; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 1/29/21. 1/29/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, ) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 3:20-cv-02302. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Transfer Venue. This action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the case in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 1/28/21 (jam) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/29/2021.] (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Concurrence by Bethlehem Haulage LLC re #5 MOTION to Transfer Case . (Keefe, Eileen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/29/2021.] (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Transfer Case by Bethlehem Haulage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Keefe, Eileen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/29/2021.] (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order approving #3 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead. Time extended by 60 days, through and including 2/15/21. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 12/16/10. (jam) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/29/2021.] (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead by Bethlehem Haulage LLC. (Keefe, Eileen) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/29/2021.] (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 12/10/20. (jam) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/29/2021.] (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bethlehem Haulage LLC from Court of Common Pleas of Schuylkill County, case number S-1648-20. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAMDC-5380095) filed by Bethlehem Haulage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/29/2021.] (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL J. FIORILLO