This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/21/2020 at 12:18:58 (UTC).

NELSON v. AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2020 NELSON filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James R. Sweeney II and Mark J. Dinsmore. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01688

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James R. Sweeney II

Referral Judge

Mark J. Dinsmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JANICE L. NELSON

Defendants

JAMES R. JOHNSON

AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

CELADON TRUCKING SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Edward Dumas

Attorney at HOSTETTER & ASSOCIATES

515 North Green Street, Suite 200

Brownsburg, IN 46112

Defendant Attorneys

Robert R. Foos

Attorney at LEWIS WAGNER, LLP

501 Indiana Avenue, Suite 200

Indianapolis, IN 46202-6150

Robert Scott O'Dell

Attorney at O'DELL & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

14747 Oak Road, Suite 100

Carmel, IN 46033

 

Court Documents

20 #1

Envelope

#20

(#20) The Clerk of the Montgomery Superior Court acknowledges receipt of the remanded case file in 54D01-1909-CT-001088. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JDH) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#18

(#18) Transfer Letter to the Clerk of the Montgomery Superior Court County Court. Copies of case documents and docket enclosed. (JDH) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#17

(#17) CLOSED REMANDED to Marion County Superior Court - ORDER ON PETITION FOR REMOVAL AND JOINT MOTION TO REMAND - AFIC's and Nelson's joint motion to remand (ECF No. #15 ) is granted. The Court hereby remands this case to the Montgomery County Superior Court in the State of Indiana, with costs to be borne by each party. The Clerk is directed to take all steps necessary to effectuate a remand. (See Order). Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 7/7/2020.(JDH) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#16

(#16) Submission of Proposed Order , re #15 Joint MOTION to Remand , filed by Defendant AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (O'Dell, Robert) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

#19

(#19) MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/1/2020. Agreed Motion to Remand was filed prior to conference, which resolved issue conference was scheduled to discuss. Conference concluded without further order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD) (Entered: 07/12/2020)

#15

(#15) Joint MOTION to Remand , filed by Defendant AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (O'Dell, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#13

(#13) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER (TIME ONLY) - This matter is scheduled for a telephonic status conference on Wednesday, July 1, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. The Court, sua sponte, hereby changes the time to 12:00 p.m. (Eastern). All other requirements of the Court's Scheduling Order [Dkt. #12 ] remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 6/29/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/1/2020 09:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. The purpose of the conference is to discuss issues with the removal of this action to this Court. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court 's ECF system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 6/26/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

11 #1

Exhibit F - State Court Complaint

#11

(#11) EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal by AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F - State Court Complaint)(O'Dell, Robert) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E, Notice Removal State Court

1 #4

Exhibit D, Demand Letter

1 #3

Exhibit C, Policy of Insurance

1 #2

Exhibit B, Sec of State Info

1 #1

Exhibit A, State Court Record

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County Superior Court, case number 54D01-1909-CT-1088, filed by AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6042467) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B, Sec of State Info, #3 Exhibit C, Policy of Insurance, #4 Exhibit D, Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit E, Notice Removal State Court, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Dell, Robert) Modified on 6/23/2020 (REO). (Entered: 06/22/2020)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) The Clerk of the Montgomery Superior Court acknowledges receipt of the remanded case file in 54D01-1909-CT-001088. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JDH) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Transfer Letter to the Clerk of the Montgomery Superior Court County Court. Copies of case documents and docket enclosed. (JDH) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CLOSED REMANDED to Marion County Superior Court - ORDER ON PETITION FOR REMOVAL AND JOINT MOTION TO REMAND - AFIC's and Nelson's joint motion to remand (ECF No. #15 ) is granted. The Court hereby remands this case to the Montgomery County Superior Court in the State of Indiana, with costs to be borne by each party. The Clerk is directed to take all steps necessary to effectuate a remand. (See Order). Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 7/7/2020.(JDH) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Submission of Proposed Order , re #15 Joint MOTION to Remand , filed by Defendant AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (O'Dell, Robert) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/1/2020. Agreed Motion to Remand was filed prior to conference, which resolved issue conference was scheduled to discuss. Conference concluded without further order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD) (Entered: 07/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Joint MOTION to Remand , filed by Defendant AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (O'Dell, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER (TIME ONLY) - This matter is scheduled for a telephonic status conference on Wednesday, July 1, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. The Court, sua sponte, hereby changes the time to 12:00 p.m. (Eastern). All other requirements of the Court's Scheduling Order [Dkt. #12 ] remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 6/29/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/1/2020 09:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. The purpose of the conference is to discuss issues with the removal of this action to this Court. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court 's ECF system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 6/26/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal by AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F - State Court Complaint)(O'Dell, Robert) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (O'Dell, Robert) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE TO REMOVAL, filed by Plaintiff JANICE L NELSON. (Dumas, Matthew) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Edward Dumas on behalf of Plaintiff JANICE L NELSON. (Dumas, Matthew) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY re #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 NOTICE of Filing, #1 Notice of Removal (O'Dell, Robert) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Filing in STATE COURT by AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, Notice of Filing Petition Removal) (O'Dell, Robert) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (O'Dell, Robert) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Scott O'Dell on behalf of Defendant AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (O'Dell, Robert) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County Superior Court, case number 54D01-1909-CT-1088, filed by AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6042467) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B, Sec of State Info, #3 Exhibit C, Policy of Insurance, #4 Exhibit D, Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit E, Notice Removal State Court, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Dell, Robert) Modified on 6/23/2020 (REO). (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CELADON TRUCKING SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Edward Dumas