This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2022 at 08:16:58 (UTC).

Nelson et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/16/2022 Nelson filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy D. DeGiusti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00396

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy D. DeGiusti

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jacob Nelson

Luella Nelson

Defendants

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Rick Johnston Insurance Agency Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Carole L Dulisse

Attorney at Marr Law Firm

4301 Sw 3Rd St, Suite 110

Oklahoma City, OK 73108

Chad E Ihrig

Attorney at Nix Patterson LLP - AUSTIN

8701 Bee Cave Road, Building 1

Austin, TX 78746

J Revell Parrish

Attorney at Whitten Burrage

512 N Broadway Ave, Suite 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Jeffrey D Marr

Attorney at Marr Law Firm

4301 Sw 3Rd St, Suite 110

Oklahoma City, OK 73108

Michael Burrage

Attorney at Whitten Burrage

512 N Broadway Ave, Suite 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Nicholas A Marr

Attorney at Nix Patterson LLP - OKC

512 N Broadway Ave, Suite 206

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Reggie N Whitten

Attorney at Whitten Burrage

512 N Broadway Ave, Suite 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorneys

Paige A Masters

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy-OKC

Braniff Building, 324 N Robinson Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Timila S Rother

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy-OKC

Braniff Building, 324 N Robinson Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. (Marr, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

14 #5

Exhibit 5 - Policy

14 #4

Exhibit 4 - Declarations Page

14 #3

Exhibit 3 - Sang Petition

14 #2

Exhibit 2 - Belardo Petition

14 #1

Exhibit 1 - Raley Petition

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Marr, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#12

(#12) ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas Andrew Marr, I on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Marr, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#11

(#11) ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey D Marr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Marr, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#10

(#10) ENTRY of Appearance by Paige A Masters on behalf of Rick Johnston Insurance Agency Inc (Masters, Paige) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#9

(#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Timila S Rother on behalf of Rick Johnston Insurance Agency Inc (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE (other) by Rick Johnston Insurance Agency Inc re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice in Lieu of a Responsive Pleading Because it is a Fraudulently Joined Defendant (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Summons R. Johnston Insurance Agency

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Summons SFFCC

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Petition

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. (Marr, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Raley Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Belardo Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Sang Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declarations Page, #5 Exhibit 5 - Policy)(Rother, Timila) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Marr, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas Andrew Marr, I on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Marr, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey D Marr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Marr, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Notice of Removal Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3914702. (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ENTRY of Appearance by Paige A Masters on behalf of Rick Johnston Insurance Agency Inc (Masters, Paige) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Timila S Rother on behalf of Rick Johnston Insurance Agency Inc (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE (other) by Rick Johnston Insurance Agency Inc re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice in Lieu of a Responsive Pleading Because it is a Fraudulently Joined Defendant (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer to Plaintiffs' Petition by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Rother, Timila) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Paige A Masters on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Masters, Paige) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Timila S Rother on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company . (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Timila S Rother on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Paige A Masters on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Masters, Paige) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Grady County District Court, case number CJ-2022-65 filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons SFFCC, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons R. Johnston Insurance Agency, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(km) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timila S Rother

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paige A Masters