This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 07:50:34 (UTC).

Nelson et al v. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Nelson filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Analisa Torres. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06538

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Analisa Torres

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Midori T. Nelson

John C. Nelson

Defendant

Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Linda P. Nussbaum

Attorney at Nussbaum Law Group, P.C.

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Defendant Attorneys

Jane Baek O'Brien

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP (DC)

2001 K Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Susanna Michele Buergel

Attorney at Paul Weiss (NY)

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Crystal Johnson Geise

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

2001 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Anika Rappleye

Attorney at Paul Weiss (NY)

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Brad Scott Karp

Attorney at Paul Weiss (NY)

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

10 #3

Text of Proposed Order

10 #2

Exhibit Declaration of Bart D. Cohen

#10

No Description Available

#7

No Description Available

#6

(#6) FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from LINDA P. NUSSBAUM dated AUGUST 18, 2020 re: Tillman v. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, No. 1:20-cv-05914-AT, Grossman v. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, No. 1:20-cv-06012-AT, Behar v. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, No. 1:20-cv-06300-AT, Dalton v. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, No. 1:20-cv-06468-AT, Nelson v. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, No. 1:20-cv-06538-UA. Document filed by John C. Nelson, Midori T. Nelson..(Nussbaum, Linda) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC..(pc) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#20

(#19) LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Interim Co-Lead Counsel for Class Plaintiffs dated October 5, 2020 re: Subject Matter Jurisdiction Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332. Document filed by Richard Grossman, Howard Katz, John C. Nelson, Midori T. Nelson.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05914-AT et al..(Nussbaum, Linda) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

19 #33

(#18) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Counsel for All Parties dated October 1, 2020 re: Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Richard Grossman, Howard Katz, John C. Nelson, Midori T. Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05914-AT et al..(Nussbaum, Linda) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#18

(#17) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley,, Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc.,, Other Affiliate Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., 7-1 Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8330 for Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC. Document filed by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05914-AT et al..(O'Brien, Jane) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#17

(#16) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anika Rappleye on behalf of Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05914-AT et al..(Rappleye, Anika) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#16

(#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Crystal Johnson Geise on behalf of Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05914-AT et al..(Geise, Crystal) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#15

(#14) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jane Baek O'Brien on behalf of Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05914-AT et al..(O'Brien, Jane) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#14

(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susanna Michele Buergel on behalf of Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05914-AT et al..(Buergel, Susanna) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#13

(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brad Scott Karp on behalf of Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05914-AT et al..(Karp, Brad) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#4

(#4) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-06012. Document filed by John C. Nelson, Midori T. Nelson..(Nussbaum, Linda) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Nussbaum, Linda) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#1

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John C. Nelson, Midori T. Nelson..(Nussbaum, Linda) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Analisa Torres: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/8/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05914-AT et al.(ap) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Interim Co-Lead Counsel for Class Plaintiffs dated October 5, 2020 re: Subject Matter Jurisdiction Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332. Document filed by Richard Grossman, Howard Katz, John C. Nelson, Midori T. Nelson.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05914-AT et al..(Nussbaum, Linda) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Counsel for All Parties dated October 1, 2020 re: Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Richard Grossman, Howard Katz, John C. Nelson, Midori T. Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05914-AT et al..(Nussbaum, Linda) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley,, Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc.,, Other Affiliate Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., 7-1 Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8330 for Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC. Document filed by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05914-AT et al..(O'Brien, Jane) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anika Rappleye on behalf of Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05914-AT et al..(Rappleye, Anika) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Crystal Johnson Geise on behalf of Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05914-AT et al..(Geise, Crystal) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jane Baek O'Brien on behalf of Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05914-AT et al..(O'Brien, Jane) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susanna Michele Buergel on behalf of Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05914-AT et al..(Buergel, Susanna) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brad Scott Karp on behalf of Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05914-AT et al..(Karp, Brad) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER CONSOLIDATING ALL RELATED CASES AND APPOINTING INTERIM CO-LEAD CLASS COUNSEL AND EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE granting (24) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:20-cv-05914-AT; granting (14) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:20-cv-06012-AT; granting (11) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:20-cv-06300-AT; granting (12) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:20-cv-06468-AT; granting (10) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:20-cv-06538-AT; granting (17) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:20-cv-06610-AT; granting (10) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:20-cv-06640-AT; granting (9) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:20-cv-06984-AT. Having reviewed the parties' submissions, the Court hereby ORDERS that all of the above-referenced actions are consolidated, and that Plaintiffs' Joint Motion for Appointment of Jean Martin and Linda Nussbaum As Interim Co-Lead Counsel and the Appointment of An Executive Committee is GRANTED. Interim Co-Lead Counsel Jean Martin and Linda Nussbaum shall be responsible for the overall conduct of the litigation on behalf of the proposed class, including providing supervision of all Plaintiffs' counsel in this litigation. As Interim Co-Lead Counsel for the class, Ms. Martin and Ms. Nussbaum have the authority to: as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/17/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05914-AT et al. (kv) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-06012-AT. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from LINDA P. NUSSBAUM dated AUGUST 18, 2020 re: Tillman v. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, No. 1:20-cv-05914-AT, Grossman v. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, No. 1:20-cv-06012-AT, Behar v. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, No. 1:20-cv-06300-AT, Dalton v. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, No. 1:20-cv-06468-AT, Nelson v. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, No. 1:20-cv-06538-UA. Document filed by John C. Nelson, Midori T. Nelson..(Nussbaum, Linda) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC..(pc) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Analisa Torres as possibly related to 20cv6012. (pc) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-06012. Document filed by John C. Nelson, Midori T. Nelson..(Nussbaum, Linda) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John C. Nelson, Midori T. Nelson..(Nussbaum, Linda) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Nussbaum, Linda) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21186175)Document filed by Midori T. Nelson, John C. Nelson..(Nussbaum, Linda) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less