This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/26/2022 at 07:44:12 (UTC).

Nelson et al v. Great West Casualty Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 Nelson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Great West Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian A. Jackson and Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00350

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian A. Jackson

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Edmond Nelson

Levell Bagneris

Defendants

Great West Casualty Company

Bryan Irvin

T. Lambert, Inc

J. L. Barnett Trucking, Inc.

3D Construction

Bryan Eugene Irvin

T. Lambert, Inc doing business as J.L. Barnett Trucking, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Craig S Leydecker

Attorney at Law Office of Craig Leydecker

505 Amelia St, Ste. 406

Gretna, LA 70056

Cassie Preston Gailmor

Attorney at Alvendia, Kelly & Demarest, LLC

909 Poydras St., Ste 1625

New Orleans, LA 70112

Ellen B Thornton

Attorney at The Law Office of Craig Leydecker

505 Amelia Street

Gretna, LA 70053

Jeanne K. Demarest

Attorney at Law Office of Alvendia Kelly & Demarest

909 Poydras St., Suite 1625

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew David Weinstock

Attorney at Duplass, Zwain, Bourgeois, Morton, Pfister & Weinstock

Three Lakeway Center

Joseph C. McAloon

Attorney at Duplass Zwain Bourgeois Pfister Weinstock & Bogart

3838 N. Causeway Blvd., Ste. 2900

Metairie, LA 70002

Raven Ann Fielding

Attorney at Duplass, Zwain, Bourgeois, Pfister & Weinstock

3838 N. Causeway Blvd., Ste. 2900

Metairie, LA 70002

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 18th JDC Parish of West Baton Rouge State Court, Case Number 10473851. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2433704), filed by J. L. Barnett Trucking, Inc., Bryan Irvin, Great West Casualty Company, 3D Construction, T. Lambert, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Pleading; Notice to State Court, #3 Attachment Notice of Compliance, #4 Attachment Certificate of Service, #5 Attachment Notice to Adverse Party, #6 Attachment Redacted medicals - Nelson, #7 Attachment Redacted medicals - Bagneris)(Fielding, Raven) ( #8 State Court Records) . Modified on 6/6/2022 to add attachment as per Order #3 (LLH). (Entered: 05/27/2022)

1 #1

Proposed Pleading; Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Pleading; Notice to State Court

1 #3

Attachment Notice of Compliance

1 #4

Attachment Certificate of Service

1 #5

Attachment Notice to Adverse Party

1 #6

Attachment Redacted medicals - Nelson

1 #7

Attachment Redacted medicals - Bagneris

#2

(#2) MOTION to Supplement #1 Notice of Removal by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Original Petition for Damages, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Fielding, Raven) Modified on 6/1/2022 text to reflect correct document title (JEG). (Entered: 05/31/2022)

2 #1

Attachment Original Petition for Damages

2 #2

Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order

#4

(#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: A Telephone Scheduling Conference is set for 8/11/2022 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Counsel for Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the Court at (225) 389-3602. Status Report due by 7/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/17/2022.(SGO) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Enroll Cassie P. Gailmor as Additional Attorney by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Demarest, Jeanne) Modified on 7/8/2022 to remove duplicate text (JEG). (Entered: 07/06/2022)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Great West Casualty Company, Bryan Eugene Irvin, T. Lambert, Inc.(Fielding, Raven) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #5 Joint Motion to Enroll. Attorney Cassie Preston Gailmor is enrolled as co-counsel for Plaintiffs Levell Bagneris and Edmond Nelson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/11/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interested Parties by 3D Construction, Great West Casualty Company, Bryan Eugene Irvin, T. Lambert, Inc identifying Affiliate/Interested Person Raven A. Fielding Duplass Law Firm for 3D Construction, Bryan Eugene Irvin, Great West Casualty Company, T. Lambert, Inc. (Fielding, Raven) (Main Document 7 replaced on 7/12/2022 to flatten image) (JEG). (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Great West Casualty Company, Bryan Eugene Irvin, T. Lambert, Inc.(Fielding, Raven) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Enroll Cassie P. Gailmor as Attorney MOTION to Enroll Cassie P. Gailmor as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JEG) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Enroll Cassie P. Gailmor as Additional Attorney by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Demarest, Jeanne) Modified on 7/8/2022 to remove duplicate text (JEG). (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: A Telephone Scheduling Conference is set for 8/11/2022 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Counsel for Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the Court at (225) 389-3602. Status Report due by 7/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/17/2022.(SGO) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Supplement Notice of Removal. The Clerk's Office shall file R. Doc. 2-1 as an attachment to R. Doc. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/3/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Amend #1 Notice of Removal. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JEG) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Supplement #1 Notice of Removal by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Original Petition for Damages, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Fielding, Raven) Modified on 6/1/2022 text to reflect correct document title (JEG). (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 18th JDC Parish of West Baton Rouge State Court, Case Number 10473851. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2433704), filed by J. L. Barnett Trucking, Inc., Bryan Irvin, Great West Casualty Company, 3D Construction, T. Lambert, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Pleading; Notice to State Court, #3 Attachment Notice of Compliance, #4 Attachment Certificate of Service, #5 Attachment Notice to Adverse Party, #6 Attachment Redacted medicals - Nelson, #7 Attachment Redacted medicals - Bagneris)(Fielding, Raven) ( #8 State Court Records) . Modified on 6/6/2022 to add attachment as per Order #3 (LLH). (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREAT WEST CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raven Fielding