This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/27/2021 at 07:05:02 (UTC).

Nelms v. QuikTrip Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 Nelms filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against QuikTrip Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark Pittman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00904

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark Pittman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Nelms

Defendant

QuikTrip Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Wesley M Hightower

Attorney at Blaies & Hightower

421 W. Third Street, Suite 900

Fort Worth, TX 76102

M. Chase Price

Attorney at Blaies & Hightower. LLP

420 Throckmorton Street, Suite 1200

Fort Worth, TX 76102

M Chase Price

Attorney at Blaies & Hightower LLP

420 Throckmorton St, Suite 1200

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Defendant Attorneys

B Kyle Briscoe

Attorney at Peavler|Briscoe

2215 Westgate Plaza

Grapevine, TX 76051

Nicolas Michael Lund

Attorney at Peavler|Briscoe

2215 Westgate Plaza

Grapevine, TX 76051

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Additional Page(s)

1 #2

Exhibit(s)

1 #3

Cover Sheet

1 #4

Cover Sheet Supplement

#2

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of M. Chase Price. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 8/13/2021) (chmb)(cpb) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by James Nelms. (Hightower, Wesley) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney M. Chase Price (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12123848) filed by James Nelms (Hightower, Wesley) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (pef) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by James Nelms. (See document #1 -2 for image) (pef) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by QuikTrip Corporation. (Briscoe, B) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by QuikTrip Corporation. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12094770) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Briscoe, B) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QuikTrip Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicolas Michael Lund

Latest cases represented by Lawyer B Kyle Briscoe