This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/14/2020 at 07:46:21 (UTC).

Nekouee v. Meghna Hotel Group, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/15/2020 Nekouee filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Meghna Hotel Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip A. Brimmer and S. Kato Crews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02459

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip A. Brimmer

Referral Judge

S. Kato Crews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fred Nekouee

Defendant

Meghna Hotel Group, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Joseph Vincze

Attorney at Robert J. Vincze, Law Offices of

Po Box 792

Andover, KS 67002

Defendant Attorney

Timothy Michael Murphy

Attorney at Hall & Evans LLC-Denver

1001 Seventeenth Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Meghna Hotel Group, LLC.(Murphy, Timothy) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Meghna Hotel Group, LLC. (Murphy, Timothy) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fred Nekouee. Meghna Hotel Group, LLC served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. (Vincze, Robert) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

3 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (apesa, ) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

1 #2

Summons Meghna Hotel Group, LLC

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Meghna Hotel Group, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7438425)Attorney Robert Joseph Vincze added to party Fred Nekouee(pty:pla), filed by Fred Nekouee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Meghna Hotel Group, LLC)(Vincze, Robert) (Entered: 08/15/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • Docket(#10) Setting Telephonic Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 11-5-2020 at 10:00am in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 10-29-2020. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form [3-1] is due 10-29-2020. Dial in information for the Scheduling Conference is as follows:CONFERENCE CALL LINE: (888) 251-2909ACCESS CODE: 5662814# SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 09-30-2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2). (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Meghna Hotel Group, LLC.(Murphy, Timothy) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. As an initial matter, the Court notes the Motion is untimely under Chief Judge Brimmer's Practice Standards. Specifically, Chief Judge Brimmer requires motions for extensions of time be filed three days before the item at issue is due. PAB Civ. Practice Standards I.G.(2). This Motion was filed on the day Defendant's answer was due and is late and could be denied on that basis alone. However, because the case is still in its beginning phase, discovery has not yet been set, and the extension of time will not negatively impact the parties or the case, the Court finds good cause to GRANT Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The parties are reminded to review and adhere to both Chief Judge Brimmer and the undersigned's Practice Standards throughout the pendency of this matter. Defendant's Answer is due 09-30-2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 09-11-2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2). (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM regarding #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Meghna Hotel Group, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/9/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Meghna Hotel Group, LLC. (Murphy, Timothy) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fred Nekouee. Meghna Hotel Group, LLC served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. (Vincze, Robert) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/17/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (apesa, ) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (apesa, ) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Meghna Hotel Group, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7438425)Attorney Robert Joseph Vincze added to party Fred Nekouee(pty:pla), filed by Fred Nekouee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Meghna Hotel Group, LLC)(Vincze, Robert) (Entered: 08/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Joseph Vincze