This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/02/2021 at 07:12:19 (UTC).

Nekouee v. Denver West Village, L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 06/16/2020 Nekouee filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Denver West Village, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott T. Varholak and William J. Martinez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01779

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Scott T. Varholak

Presiding Judge

William J. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fred Nekouee

Defendant

SWH Mimi's Cafe, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Joseph Vincze

Attorney at Robert J. Vincze, Law Offices of

Po Box 792

Andover, KS 67002

Defendant Attorneys

Nathan Andrew Schacht

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP-Denver

1801 California Street, Suite 4400

Denver, CO 80202

Christopher Daniel Bryan

Attorney at Hall & Evans LLC-Denver

1001 Seventeenth Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80202

Timothy Michael Murphy

Attorney at Hall & Evans LLC-Denver

1001 Seventeenth Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#48

#45

#43

#41

#39

3 #5

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

3 #4

Summons

3 #3

Summons

3 #2

Summons

3 #1

Summons

#3

1 #6

Summons SWH Mimi's Cafe, LLC

1 #5

Summons OfficeMax North America, Inc.

1 #4

Summons Whole Foods Market Rocky Mountain, Southwest, L.P.

1 #3

Summons Qdoba Restaurant Corporation

1 #2

Summons Denver West Village, L.P.

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #48 STIPULATION of Dismissal filed in this case on 11/30/2020. Text Only Entry (angar, ) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Def. SWH Mimi's Cafe, LLC and by Plaintiff Fred Nekouee. (Vincze, Robert) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORDER granting #45 Motion for Order. Plaintiff and Defendant SWH Mimis Caf, LLC shall file dismissal papers or a report regarding the status of settlement on or before 11/30/2020. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 11/23/2020. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, ) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MEMORANDUM regarding #45 MOTION for Order to filed by SWH Mimi's Cafe, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/23/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) STATUS REPORT as to Dismissal Pleadings by Defendant SWH Mimi's Cafe, LLC. (Murphy, Timothy) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Party Denver West Village, L.P. (a Delaware limited partnership) terminated pursuant to #43 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party filed in this case on 11/13/2020. Text Only Entry (angar, ) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party by Defendant Denver West Village, L.P. and by Plaintiff Fred Nekouee. (Vincze, Robert) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to #41 Notice of Settlement, Plaintiff and Defendant SWH MIMIS CAFE, LLC shall file dismissal papers or a report regarding the status of settlement on or before 11/20/2020. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/29/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, ) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE of Settlement with Defendant SWH Mimi's Cafe, LLC by Plaintiff Fred Nekouee (Vincze, Robert) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to #39 Notice of Settlement, Plaintiff and Defendant Denver West Village, L.P. shall file dismissal papers or a report regarding the status of settlement on or before 11/18/2020. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/27/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Settlement with OfficeMax North America, Inc. by Plaintiff Fred Nekouee (Vincze, Robert) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fred Nekouee. Whole Foods Market Rocky Mountain, Southwest, L.P. served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Vincze, Robert) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fred Nekouee. SWH Mimi's Cafe, LLC served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Vincze, Robert) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fred Nekouee. Qdoba Restaurant Corporation served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Vincze, Robert) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fred Nekouee. Officemax North America, Inc. served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Vincze, Robert) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fred Nekouee. Denver West Village, L.P. served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Vincze, Robert) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/19/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 8/5/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/12/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/17/2020. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (cmadr, ) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Denver West Village, L.P., Officemax North America, Inc., Qdoba Restaurant Corporation, SWH Mimi's Cafe, LLC, Whole Foods Market Rocky Mountain, Southwest, L.P. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7344550)Attorney Robert Joseph Vincze added to party Fred Nekouee(pty:pla), filed by Fred Nekouee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Denver West Village, L.P., #3 Summons Qdoba Restaurant Corporation, #4 Summons Whole Foods Market Rocky Mountain, Southwest, L.P., #5 Summons OfficeMax North America, Inc., #6 Summons SWH Mimi's Cafe, LLC)(Vincze, Robert) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SWH MIMI'S CAFE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Joseph Vincze