Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/02/2019 at 12:07:51 (UTC).

Neier v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 05/03/2019 Neier filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jon E DeGuilio. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00196

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon E DeGuilio

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mitchal D Neier

Defendants

Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Commissioner of Social Security

Not Classified By Court

SSA (Court Use Only)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

C David Little

Attorney at Power Little Little & Little

253 N Jackson St

Frankfort, IN 46041

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The payment of the filing fee is WAIVED. The US Marshals Service is DIRECTED to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 5/7/2019. (mrm) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USM obo Mitchal D Neier. Commissioner of Social Security and US Attorney's Office served on 5/21/2019 and Attorney General served on 5/20/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (mrm) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only.(Copy to USM)(mrm) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The payment of the filing fee is WAIVED. The US Marshals Service is DIRECTED to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 5/7/2019. (mrm) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Judge Jon E DeGuilio added. (New Case) (IFP Motion Pending) (sct) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by C David Little on behalf of Mitchal D Neier (Little, C) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by 3 copies of summons forms and 3 copies of USM-285 forms by Plaintiff Mitchal D Neier. (Little, C) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR DISABILITY BENEFITS against Commissioner of Social Security Administration, filed by Mitchal D Neier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Regional Chief Counsel, #3 Proposed Summons United States Attorney General, #4 Proposed Summons Assistant United States Attorney, #5 Supplement USM-285 Regional Chief Counsel, #6 Supplement USM-285 United States Attorney General, #7 Supplement USM-285 Assistant United States Attorney)(Little, C) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer C. David Little