This case was last updated from PACER on 10/20/2020 at 08:12:58 (UTC).

Nehemiah Kong v. ABS CA-O LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 Nehemiah Kong filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against ABS CA-O LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alka Sagar and John F. Walter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-07594

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nehemiah Kong

Defendants

Does 1-10

ABS CA-O LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Russell C Handy

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorney

Theodore K Bell

Attorney at Safeway Inc

11555 Dublin Canyon Road

Pleasanton, CA 94588-2815

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-3 Days, filed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong.. (Price, Dennis) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#13

(#13) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for November 2, 2020 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before October 19, 2020. (iv) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#12

(#12) DECLARATION of Theodore K. Bell filed by Defendant ABS CA-O LLC. (Bell, Theodore) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#11

(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ABS CA-O LLC identifying ABS CA-O LLC as Corporate Parent. (Bell, Theodore) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant ABS CA-O LLC.(Attorney Theodore K Bell added to party ABS CA-O LLC(pty:dft))(Bell, Theodore) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, upon Defendant ABS CA-O LLC served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process:Jessie Gastelum, intake specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant ABS CA-O LLC. (lh) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Brian Whitaker Nehemiah Kong. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27727603 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Nehemiah Kong(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-3 Days, filed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong.. (Price, Dennis) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for November 2, 2020 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before October 19, 2020. (iv) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DECLARATION of Theodore K. Bell filed by Defendant ABS CA-O LLC. (Bell, Theodore) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ABS CA-O LLC identifying ABS CA-O LLC as Corporate Parent. (Bell, Theodore) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant ABS CA-O LLC.(Attorney Theodore K Bell added to party ABS CA-O LLC(pty:dft))(Bell, Theodore) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, upon Defendant ABS CA-O LLC served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process:Jessie Gastelum, intake specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant ABS CA-O LLC. (lh) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Brian Whitaker Nehemiah Kong. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27727603 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Nehemiah Kong(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABS CA-O LLC is a litigant