This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2020 at 09:26:10 (UTC).

Neeser v. MAC Acquisition LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 Neeser filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against MAC Acquisition LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frank D. Whitney and David Keesler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00389

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frank D. Whitney

Referral Judge

David Keesler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kristin Neeser

Defendants

MAC Acquisition LLC

Sullivan's Holding LLC doing business as Sullivan's Steakhouse

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gilda Adriana Hernandez

Attorney at The Law Offices of Gilda A. Hernandez, PLLC

1020 Southhill Drive, Suite 130

Cary, NC 27513

Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci

Attorney at The Law Offices of Gilda A. Hernandez, PLLC

1020 Southhill Drive, Suite 130

Cary, NC 27513

Charlotte Claire Smith

Attorney at The Law Offices of Gilda A. Hernandez, PLLC

1020 Southhill Drive, Suite 130

Cary, NC 27513

Defendant Attorney

Steven Andrew Nigh

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, PC

100 North Tryon St., Suite 4150

Charlotte, NC 28202

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sullivan's Holding LLC (Nigh, Steven) (Main Document 11 replaced on 9/2/2020) (js). Modified to reflect correct attachment on 9/2/2020 (js). (Main Document 11 replaced on 9/3/2020) (eef). (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MAC Acquisition LLC (Nigh, Steven) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants shall file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before September 14, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/20/20. (mga) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by MAC Acquisition LLC, Sullivan's Holding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nigh, Steven). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 08/20/2020)

7 #2

Exhibit B - Proof of Service on Defendant Sullivan's Holding LLC

7 #1

Exhibit A - Proof of Service on Defendant MAC Acquisition LLC

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Kristin Neeser. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service on Defendant MAC Acquisition LLC, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service on Defendant Sullivan's Holding LLC)(Hernandez, Gilda) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

6 #1

Summons -Mac Acquisition

#6

(#6) Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons -Mac Acquisition)(js) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci on behalf of Kristin Neeser (Tucci, Robert) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Charlotte Claire Smith on behalf of Kristin Neeser (Smith, Charlotte) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Gilda Adriana Hernandez on behalf of Kristin Neeser (Hernandez, Gilda) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit A - Notice and Consent to File Suit as Named Plaintiff

1 #3

Exhibit Proposed Civil Summons - Sullivan's Holding LLC

1 #2

Exhibit Proposed Civil Summons - MAC Acquisition LLC

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4577320), filed by Kristin Neeser. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Proposed Civil Summons - MAC Acquisition LLC, #3 Exhibit Proposed Civil Summons - Sullivan's Holding LLC, #4 Exhibit A - Notice and Consent to File Suit as Named Plaintiff)(Hernandez, Gilda) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sullivan's Holding LLC (Nigh, Steven) (Main Document 11 replaced on 9/2/2020) (js). Modified to reflect correct attachment on 9/2/2020 (js). (Main Document 11 replaced on 9/3/2020) (eef). (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MAC Acquisition LLC (Nigh, Steven) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants shall file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before September 14, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/20/20. (mga) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by MAC Acquisition LLC, Sullivan's Holding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nigh, Steven). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Kristin Neeser. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service on Defendant MAC Acquisition LLC, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service on Defendant Sullivan's Holding LLC)(Hernandez, Gilda) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons -Mac Acquisition)(js) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketClerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (js) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Wesley Thayer Tucci on behalf of Kristin Neeser (Tucci, Robert) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Charlotte Claire Smith on behalf of Kristin Neeser (Smith, Charlotte) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Gilda Adriana Hernandez on behalf of Kristin Neeser (Hernandez, Gilda) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kristin Neeser (Hernandez, Gilda) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4577320), filed by Kristin Neeser. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Proposed Civil Summons - MAC Acquisition LLC, #3 Exhibit Proposed Civil Summons - Sullivan's Holding LLC, #4 Exhibit A - Notice and Consent to File Suit as Named Plaintiff)(Hernandez, Gilda) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less