This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 08:17:19 (UTC).

Neck Hammock, The v. EON Concepts et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Neck Hammock, The filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against EON Concepts. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale A. Kimball and Dustin B. Pead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00959

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale A. Kimball

Referral Judge

Dustin B. Pead

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Neck Hammock, The

Defendants

Lee Zhi Xing

EON Concepts

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian N. Platt

Attorney at WORKMAN NYDEGGER

60 E South Temple Ste 1000

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Brent P. Lorimer

Attorney at WORKMAN NYDEGGER

60 E South Temple Ste 1000

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to Defendants in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/6/2019. (eat) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tlh) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

(#3) Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tlh) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

2 #8

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

2 #7

Exhibit G - '494 Patent

2 #6

Exhibit F - '492 Patent

2 #5

Exhibit E - '035 Patent

2 #4

Exhibit D - '284 Patent

2 #3

Exhibit C - 079 Trademark

2 #2

Exhibit B - '768 Trademark

2 #1

Exhibit A - '795 Trademark

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3433964) filed by Neck Hammock, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '795 Trademark, #2 Exhibit B - '768 Trademark, #3 Exhibit C - 079 Trademark, #4 Exhibit D - '284 Patent, #5 Exhibit E - '035 Patent, #6 Exhibit F - '492 Patent, #7 Exhibit G - '494 Patent, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (Platt, Brian) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Plaintiff Neck Hammock, The is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to Defendants in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/6/2019. (eat) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 12/5/2019. (eat) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tlh) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tlh) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3433964) filed by Neck Hammock, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '795 Trademark, #2 Exhibit B - '768 Trademark, #3 Exhibit C - 079 Trademark, #4 Exhibit D - '284 Patent, #5 Exhibit E - '035 Patent, #6 Exhibit F - '492 Patent, #7 Exhibit G - '494 Patent, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball (Platt, Brian) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dale A. Kimball. Plaintiff Neck Hammock, The is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less