This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/04/2022 at 07:54:14 (UTC).

NearVerse, Inc. v. Cisco Systems Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/06/2022 NearVerse, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Cisco Systems Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Alan D Albright and Derek T. Gilliland. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00736

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

Referral Judge

Derek T. Gilliland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NearVerse, Inc.

Defendant

Cisco Systems Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard L. Wernow

Attorney at Sand, Sebolt & Wernow Co., LPA

Aegis Tower - Suite 1100, 4940 Munson Street Nw

Canton, OH 44718

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth Rogers Brannen

Attorney at Stris & Maher LLP

777 South Figueroa Street, Suite 3850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Eric H. Findlay

Attorney at Findlay Craft, P.C.

102 N. College Ave., Suite 900

Tyler, TX 75702

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16220564), filed by NearVerse, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US8634853, #2 Exhibit B-Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wernow, Howard) (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/7/2022) (bw). (Entered: 07/06/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A-US8634853

1 #2

Exhibit B-Claim Chart

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by NearVerse, Inc.. (Wernow, Howard) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/7/2022) (bw). (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NearVerse, Inc.. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Wernow, Howard) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/7/2022) (bw). (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Cisco Systems Inc.. (bw) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by NearVerse, Inc.. Cisco Systems Inc. served on 7/14/2022, answer due 8/4/2022. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer, Move, Or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Cisco Systems Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Rogers Brannen on behalf of Cisco Systems Inc.. Attorney Elizabeth Rogers Brannen added to party Cisco Systems Inc.(pty:dft) (Brannen, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by NearVerse, Inc. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#10

(#10) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot2) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot2) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by NearVerse, Inc. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Rogers Brannen on behalf of Cisco Systems Inc.. Attorney Elizabeth Rogers Brannen added to party Cisco Systems Inc.(pty:dft) (Brannen, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Cisco Systems Inc. answer due 9/19/2022. (lad) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer, Move, Or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Cisco Systems Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by NearVerse, Inc.. Cisco Systems Inc. served on 7/14/2022, answer due 8/4/2022. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketAll parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/ (bw) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Cisco Systems Inc.. (bw) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument [1-3], #2 and #4 were not flattened. Please notice that ALL DOCUMENTS are required to be flattened before e-filing. The US Clerk's Office has flattened any document needed prior to this notice but all parties MUST flatten ALL documents going forward. Contact the Clerk's Office for any questions. (bw) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Wernow, Howard) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/7/2022) (bw). (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NearVerse, Inc.. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by NearVerse, Inc.. (Wernow, Howard) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/7/2022) (bw). (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-16220564), filed by NearVerse, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US8634853, #2 Exhibit B-Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wernow, Howard) (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/7/2022) (bw). (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cisco Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth Rogers Brannen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric Hugh Findlay