This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/25/2022 at 07:51:05 (UTC).

Neal-Williams v. Addison, et al

Case Summary

On 12/27/2021 Neal-Williams filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Addison. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Deborah L. Boardman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03280

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Deborah L. Boardman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodjuan Orland James Neal-Williams

Boyds, MD 20841

Defendants

Addison

Oputa

Bryant

Robineth

Buttersworth

Ms. V.

Colby

Murphy

E.

Darden

Angela Tallery

Susan Malagar

Wakins

Dauis

Erekosima

Hernandez

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Addison, Bryant, Buttersworth, Colby, Darden, Dauis, E., Erekosima, Hernandez, Susan Malagar, Ms. V., Murphy, Oputa, Robineth, Angela Tallery, Wakins, filed by Rodjuan Orland James Neal-Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

1 #1

Envelope

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ORDER Directing the Finance Officer to file an inmate account summaryinformation sheet withing in 21 days. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 1/7/2022. (c/m 1/10/2022 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to electronically send copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint ( re #1 Complaint, filed by Rodjuan Orland James Neal-Williams ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments; Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 2/11/2022. (c/m 2/11/2022 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to electronically send copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint ( re #1 Complaint, filed by Rodjuan Orland James Neal-Williams ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments; Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 2/11/2022. (c/m 2/11/2022 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Correspondence received from Rodjuan Orland James Neal-Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement as to Rodjuan Orland James Neal-Williams (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER Directing the Finance Officer to file an inmate account summaryinformation sheet withing in 21 days. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 1/7/2022. (c/m 1/10/2022 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rodjuan Orland James Neal-Williams (bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Addison, Bryant, Buttersworth, Colby, Darden, Dauis, E., Erekosima, Hernandez, Susan Malagar, Ms. V., Murphy, Oputa, Robineth, Angela Tallery, Wakins, filed by Rodjuan Orland James Neal-Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Colby is a litigant

Latest cases where DARDEN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ADDISON INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bryant is a litigant