This case was last updated from PACER on 04/06/2019 at 07:02:54 (UTC).

Neal v. Seagate Court Homeowners Association, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 Neal filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Seagate Court Homeowners Association, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Orenstein and Dora Lizette Irizarry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00707

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James Orenstein

Presiding Judge

Dora Lizette Irizarry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel Neal

Defendants and Cross Claimants

Seagate Court Homeowners Association, Inc.

City of New York

The Seagate Association

Darrien Phillips

Seagate Homeowners Association

Defendant and Cross Defendant

City of New York

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joel Schmelkin

Attorney at Schmelkin Associates, P.C.

30 Vesey Street, 4Th Flr.

New York, NY 10007

Stuart E. Jacobs

Attorney at Jacobs & Hazan, LLP

30 Vesey St., Ste 4Th Floor

New York, NY 10007

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Erin Nicole Mackin

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla

200 Garden City Plaza, Suite 520

Garden City, NY 11530

Carolyn Kay Depoian

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Carolyn Kay Depoian

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #11 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by City of New York. (Depoian, Carolyn) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#16

(#16) ORDER DISMISSING PARTY, that plaintiff DANIEL NEAL hereby voluntarily dismisses and discontinues any and all of the claims arising out of the facts and circumstances that are the subject of this action and that were asserted or could have been asserted by or on behalf of plaintiff Daniel Neal against the City of New York, its successors and assignees, and any past or present officials, employees, representatives and agents of the City of New York, or any entity represented by the Office of the Corporation Counsel, with prejudiceand without costs or attorney's fees to any party. (Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 3/15/2019) C/M (Galeano, Sonia) Modified text, Order Dismissing Case to Order Dismissing Party on 4/3/2019 (Lee, Tiffeny). (Entered: 03/18/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn Kay Depoian on behalf of City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Depoian, Carolyn) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION of Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41 as to any and all claims against defendant the City of New York by City of New York (Depoian, Carolyn) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Seagate Court Homeowners Association, Inc. (Mackin, Erin) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Seagate Court Homeowners Association, Inc. (Mackin, Erin) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#11

(#11) Verified ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against City of New York by Seagate Court Homeowners Association, Inc.. (Mackin, Erin) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#10

ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer -- The motion is granted on consent. The defendants, Seagate Court Homeowners Association, Inc., Seagate Homeowners Association, The Seagate Association, and Darrien Phillips, shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by March 15, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 3/4/2019. (Gustafson, Kaelyn) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#9

No Description Available

#7

ORDER granting #7 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The motion is granted. The initial conference previously scheduled for March 15, 2019 is rescheduled for April 17, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 2/13/2019. (Gustafson, Kaelyn) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to appear for an initial discovery planning conference on, March 19, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11D South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. No later than March 15, 2019, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. Each party's counsel must be personally prepared to discuss all factual and legal issues in the case, including the possibility of settlement; otherwise, the client must attend in person as well. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 2/13/2019. (Guy, Alicia) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

#5

(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#4

(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION Corrected Civil Cover Sheet by Seagate Court Homeowners Association, Inc. (Mackin, Erin) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Seagate Court Homeowners Association, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Service of Notice of Removal (Mackin, Erin) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit A and B

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Seagate Court Homeowners Association, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Service of Notice of Removal (Mackin, Erin) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer -- The motion is granted on consent. The City shall answer or otherwise respond to the Seagate defendants' cross-claims by May 1, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 4/1/2019. (Gustafson, Kaelyn) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #11 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by City of New York. (Depoian, Carolyn) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER DISMISSING PARTY, that plaintiff DANIEL NEAL hereby voluntarily dismisses and discontinues any and all of the claims arising out of the facts and circumstances that are the subject of this action and that were asserted or could have been asserted by or on behalf of plaintiff Daniel Neal against the City of New York, its successors and assignees, and any past or present officials, employees, representatives and agents of the City of New York, or any entity represented by the Office of the Corporation Counsel, with prejudiceand without costs or attorney's fees to any party. (Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 3/15/2019) C/M (Galeano, Sonia) Modified text, Order Dismissing Case to Order Dismissing Party on 4/3/2019 (Lee, Tiffeny). (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn Kay Depoian on behalf of City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Depoian, Carolyn) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) STIPULATION of Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41 as to any and all claims against defendant the City of New York by City of New York (Depoian, Carolyn) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER re #12 Corporate Disclosure Statement and #13 Corporate Disclosure Statement -- Counsel is reminded that pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(d), discovery requests and materials produced in pretrial disclosure and discovery shall not be filed with the clerk's office except by order of the court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(d)(1) ("[D]isclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) or (2) and the following discovery requests and responses must not be filed until they are used in the proceeding or the court orders filing: depositions, interrogatories, requests for documents or tangible things or to permit entry onto land, and requests for admission."). Counsel is reminded to correctly describe those materials that are properly filed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 3/12/2019. (Gustafson, Kaelyn) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Seagate Court Homeowners Association, Inc. (Mackin, Erin) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Seagate Court Homeowners Association, Inc. (Mackin, Erin) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Verified ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against City of New York by Seagate Court Homeowners Association, Inc.. (Mackin, Erin) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer -- The motion is granted on consent. The defendants, Seagate Court Homeowners Association, Inc., Seagate Homeowners Association, The Seagate Association, and Darrien Phillips, shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by March 15, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 3/4/2019. (Gustafson, Kaelyn) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting #7 Motion to Adjourn Conference -- The motion is granted. The initial conference previously scheduled for March 15, 2019 is rescheduled for April 17, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 2/13/2019. (Gustafson, Kaelyn) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference 3.19.19 by Seagate Court Homeowners Association, Inc.. (Mackin, Erin) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to appear for an initial discovery planning conference on, March 19, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11D South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. No later than March 15, 2019, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. Each party's counsel must be personally prepared to discuss all factual and legal issues in the case, including the possibility of settlement; otherwise, the client must attend in person as well. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 2/13/2019. (Guy, Alicia) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION Corrected Civil Cover Sheet by Seagate Court Homeowners Association, Inc. (Mackin, Erin) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • NOTICE - The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Seagate Court Homeowners Association, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Service of Notice of Removal (Mackin, Erin) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Seagate Court Homeowners Association, Inc. from Kings County Supreme Court, case number 523414/2018. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11170399) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A and B) (Mackin, Erin) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.