This case was last updated from PACER on 10/10/2020 at 09:06:58 (UTC).

Neal v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/11/2020 Neal filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is George Jarrod Hazel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-02323

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George Jarrod Hazel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrea Neal

Defendants

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Procollect, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Alan Siddons

Attorney at The Law Office of Michael Alan Siddons Esq

230 N. Monroe Street, Po Box 403

Media, PA 19063

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Andrea Neal (Siddons, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Andrea Neal (Siddons, Michael) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax Information Services, LLC by Andrea Neal (Siddons, Michael) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Settlement as to ProCollect, Inc., only by Andrea Neal (Siddons, Michael) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrea Neal. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 8/14/2020, answer due 9/4/2020.(Siddons, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrea Neal. Procollect, Inc. served on 8/14/2020, answer due 9/4/2020.(Siddons, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued 21 days as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Procollect, Inc..(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#2

(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Andrea Neal (Siddons, Michael) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Procollect, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8802660.), filed by Andrea Neal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Siddons, Michael) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Andrea Neal (Siddons, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Andrea Neal (Siddons, Michael) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax Information Services, LLC by Andrea Neal (Siddons, Michael) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Settlement as to ProCollect, Inc., only by Andrea Neal (Siddons, Michael) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrea Neal. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 8/14/2020, answer due 9/4/2020.(Siddons, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrea Neal. Procollect, Inc. served on 8/14/2020, answer due 9/4/2020.(Siddons, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued 21 days as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Procollect, Inc..(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Andrea Neal (Siddons, Michael) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Procollect, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8802660.), filed by Andrea Neal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Siddons, Michael) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less