Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/26/2021 at 09:54:01 (UTC).

Neal v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 Neal filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy Percy and Neal B. Biggers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00036

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Roy Percy

Presiding Judge

Neal B. Biggers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeff Neal

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Arati C Furness

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5473 Blair Rd.

Dallas, TX 75231

Matthew Ryan McCarley

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5473 Blair Rd.

Dallas, TX 75231

Kelly Chermack

Attorney at Fears Nachawati Law Firm

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

David Shelton

Attorney at Shelton Davis, PLLC

P.O. Box 2541, 1223 Jackson Avenue East, Ste 202

Oxford, MS 38655

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B. North, Jr.

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH, LLP

201 17Th Street Nw, Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

J. Carter Thompson, Jr.

Attorney at BAKER, DONELSON, BEARMAN & CALDWELL - Jackson

One Eastover Center, 100 Vision Dr., Ste. 400, Post Office Box 14167

Jackson, MS 39236-4167

Elizabeth Ross Hadley

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG

300 West 6Th Street, Suite 2050

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 7/23/2021 10:30 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)

#23

(#23) ORDER denying #21 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/5/21. (bnd) Modified on 4/6/2021 (jla).

#22

(#22) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #21 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Hadley, Elizabeth)

#21

(#21) Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Hadley, Elizabeth)

#19

(#19) ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Kelly Chermack. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/31/21. (bnd)

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Arati C Furness and Matthew Ryan McCarley terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/29/21. (bnd)

16 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

16 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#16

(#16) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Kelly Chermack,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-1925986) by Jeff Neal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Shelton, David)

6 #4

Daubert Orders

6 #3

Case Mgt Order No. 47

6 #1

Bard Docket Sheet (Main MDL Case)

5 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-03270. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.

#4

(#4) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.] (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#3

(#3) *AMENDED By Doc. #4 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/17/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.] (Entered: 02/11/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16932898 filed by Jeff Neal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 7/23/2021 10:30 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER denying #21 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/5/21. (bnd) Modified on 4/6/2021 (jla).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #21 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Hadley, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Hadley, Elizabeth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • Docket(#20) TEXT ONLY ORDER requiring telephonic case managment conference. Counsel should call conference line 888-363-4735 (participant number 4317261) at previously scheduled time. There will be no in-person attendance permitted. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/31/21. No document attached. (rtc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Kelly Chermack. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/31/21. (bnd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Arati C Furness and Matthew Ryan McCarley terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/29/21. (bnd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jeff Neal. (Shelton, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Kelly Chermack,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-1925986) by Jeff Neal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Shelton, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Shelton on behalf of Jeff Neal (Shelton, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2021 09:30 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/1/21. (rtc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE of Failure by Counsel to be Admitted to Practice Re: Richard B. North, Jr, Matthew Ryan McCarley, Arati C Furness (jtm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Neal B. Biggers and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (jtm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MDL TRANSFER ORDER (Attachments: #1 Bard Docket Sheet (Main MDL Case), #2 Case Management Orders, #3 Case Mgt Order No. 47, #4 Daubert Orders, #5 Deposition Designation Orders, #6 Discovery and Privilege Orders, #7 Discovery Orders, #8 Master and Short-Form Pleadings, #9 Miscellaneous Orders, #10 Motions in Limine Orders) (jtm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-03270. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketRemark: Transferring Case to the Northern District of Mississippi via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.] (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) *AMENDED By Doc. #4 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/17/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.] (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-03270-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16932898 filed by Jeff Neal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/25/2021.]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelly Chermack

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Shelton