This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/07/2020 at 12:58:04 (UTC).

NCS Multistage Inc. v. TCO Products Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2020 NCS Multistage Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against TCO Products Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00622

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NCS Multistage Inc.

Defendants

TCO Products Inc.

Arsenal Inc.

TCO AS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Domingo Manuel Llagostera

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

717 Texas Avenue

Houston, TX 77002

Russell T. Wong

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

717 Texas Avenue, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

Enes Ovcina

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 6400

Houston, TX 77002

La Tasha Mabry Snipes

Attorney at Polsinelli, PC

1000 Louisiana St., Suite 6400

Houston, TX 77002

Jonathan R. Spivey

Attorney at Polsinelli

1000 Louisiana, Suite 6400

Houston, TX 77002

John D. Holman

Attorney at Matthews Lawson McCutcheon & Joseph, PLLC

2000 Bering Drive, Suite 700

Houston, TX 77057

 

Court Documents

#23

22 #2

Proposed Order

22 #1

Affidavit of Matthew Bregman

#22

21 #2

Proposed Order

21 #1

Affidavit of Steven Cramp

#21

20 #1

Proposed Order

#20

#5

4 #1

AO-120

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Claim Chart

1 #1

Exhibit Patent in Suit

#1

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Readiness in Patent Case by NCS Multistage Inc. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Improper Party by Arsenal Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Matthew Bregman, #2 Proposed Order)(Holman, John) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue by TCO Products Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Steven Cramp, #2 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketReset Answer Deadlines: Arsenal Inc. answer due 9/4/2020. (bw) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including September 4, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Arsenal Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holman, John) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John D. Holman on behalf of Arsenal Inc.. Attorney John D. Holman added to party Arsenal Inc.(pty:dft) (Holman, John) (Main Document 19 replaced on 8/4/2020) (am). (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: TCO Products Inc. answer due 9/4/2020. (am) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant TCO Products Inc.'s Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including September 4, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by NCS Multistage Inc.. Arsenal Inc. served on 7/15/2020, answer due 8/5/2020. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to TCO Products Inc.. (am) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by NCS Multistage Inc.. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Main Document 7 replaced on 7/14/2020) (am). (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Arsenal Inc.. (am) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/13/2020) (am). (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Pursuant to the Standing Order Regarding Patent/Trademark Cases effective 12/9/19, Attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco division must prepare the attached form AO120 and e-file using the "Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form" event upon opening of the case. (Attachments: #1 AO-120) (am) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NCS Multistage Inc.. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by NCS Multistage Inc.. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/13/2020) (am). (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13744447), filed by NCS Multistage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Patent in Suit, #2 Exhibit Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Llagostera, Domingo) (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/10/2020) (am). (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARSENAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NCS Multistage, LLC is a litigant