This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/12/2020 at 08:59:30 (UTC).

NCS Multistage Inc. v. Summit Casing Services, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/13/2020 NCS Multistage Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Summit Casing Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00735

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NCS Multistage Inc.

Defendant

Summit Casing Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Domingo Manuel Llagostera

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

717 Texas Avenue

Houston, TX 77002

Russell T. Wong

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

717 Texas Avenue, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

Tyler T. VanHoutan

Attorney at McGuire Woods LLP

600 Travis Street, Suite 7500

Houston, TX 77002

Matthew William Cornelia

Attorney at McGuire Woods LLP

2000 Mckinney Ave., Suite 1400

Dallas, TX 75214

Eric Stephen Schlichter

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

600 Travis St., Suite 7500

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by NCS Multistage Inc. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Summit Casing Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cornelia, Matthew) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by NCS Multistage Inc.. Summit Casing Services, LLC served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/7/2020. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Summit Casing Services, LLC. (bw) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NCS Multistage Inc.. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by NCS Multistage Inc.. to Summit Casing Services, LLC (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet JS 44

1 #3

Exhibit C_Summit Claim Chart

1 #2

Exhibit B_Photos Summit Casing Equipment

1 #1

Exhibit A_Patent

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against SUMMIT CASING SERVICES, LLC., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13861698), filed by NCS Multistage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Patent, #2 Exhibit B_Photos Summit Casing Equipment, #3 Exhibit C_Summit Claim Chart, #4 Civil Cover Sheet JS 44)(Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by NCS Multistage Inc. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Summit Casing Services, LLC answer due 10/7/2020. (mc5) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. The deadline for Defendant to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is October 7, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Summit Casing Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cornelia, Matthew) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by NCS Multistage Inc.. Summit Casing Services, LLC served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/7/2020. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Summit Casing Services, LLC. (bw) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NCS Multistage Inc.. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by NCS Multistage Inc.. to Summit Casing Services, LLC (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against SUMMIT CASING SERVICES, LLC., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13861698), filed by NCS Multistage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Patent, #2 Exhibit B_Photos Summit Casing Equipment, #3 Exhibit C_Summit Claim Chart, #4 Civil Cover Sheet JS 44)(Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NCS Multistage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew William Cornelia

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric Stephen Schlichter

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tyler T. VanHoutan