This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/28/2020 at 09:08:09 (UTC).

NCS Multistage Inc. v. Permian Petrolink, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 NCS Multistage Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Permian Petrolink, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00701

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NCS Multistage Inc.

Defendant

Permian Petrolink, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Domingo Manuel Llagostera

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

717 Texas Avenue

Houston, TX 77002

Russell T. Wong

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

717 Texas Avenue, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorney

John W. Johnson

Attorney at Creighton Fox Johnson and Mills PLLC

P.O. Box 5607

Beaumont, TX 77726-5607

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Permian Petrolink, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, John) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Permian Petrolink, LLC. (Johnson, John) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by NCS Multistage Inc.. Permian Petrolink, LLC served on 8/4/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Permian Petrolink, LLC. (am) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/31/2020) (am). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Parties by NCS Multistage Inc.. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by NCS Multistage Inc.. as to Permian Petrolink, LLC (Llagostera, Domingo) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/31/2020) (am). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet ccs

1 #3

Exhibit C_Claim Chart

1 #2

Exhibit B_Marketing Materials

1 #1

Exhibit A_Pat. 10,465,445 B2

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Permian Petrolink, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13816015), filed by NCS Multistage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Pat. 10,465,445 B2, #2 Exhibit B_Marketing Materials, #3 Exhibit C_Claim Chart, #4 Civil Cover Sheet ccs)(Llagostera, Domingo) (Attachment 4 replaced on 7/31/2020) (am). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Permian Petrolink, LLC answer due 10/6/2020. (am) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including October 6, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Permian Petrolink, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, John) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Permian Petrolink, LLC answer due 9/15/2020. (am) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including September 15, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Permian Petrolink, LLC. (Johnson, John) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by NCS Multistage Inc.. Permian Petrolink, LLC served on 8/4/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRemark: Doc. #1 Civil Cover Sheet, Doc. #2 , and Doc. #4 were not flattened. Please notice that all documents are required to be flattened upon filing. The US Clerk's Office will flatten any document needed prior but all parties MUST flatten documents going forward. Contact the Clerk's Office for any questions. (am) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Permian Petrolink, LLC. (am) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/31/2020) (am). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Parties by NCS Multistage Inc.. (Llagostera, Domingo) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by NCS Multistage Inc.. as to Permian Petrolink, LLC (Llagostera, Domingo) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/31/2020) (am). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Permian Petrolink, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13816015), filed by NCS Multistage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Pat. 10,465,445 B2, #2 Exhibit B_Marketing Materials, #3 Exhibit C_Claim Chart, #4 Civil Cover Sheet ccs)(Llagostera, Domingo) (Attachment 4 replaced on 7/31/2020) (am). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NCS Multistage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John W Johnson, II